blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1367067

EP1367067 - Highly water-absorptive ophthalmic lens and method of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.01.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.03.2005  [2005/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Menicon Co., Ltd.
21-19, Aoi 3-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/49]For all designated states
Menicon Co., Ltd.
21-19, Aoi 3-chome Naka-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ichihara, Masuji, c/o Menicon Co.
1-10 Takamoridai 5-chome
Kasugai-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
 [2003/49]
Representative(s)Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/49]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date03253212.922.05.2003
[2003/49]
Priority number, dateJP2002015185427.05.2002         Original published format: JP 2002151854
JP2002020296811.07.2002         Original published format: JP 2002202968
[2003/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1367067
Date:03.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2003
ClassificationIPC:C08F8/12, G02B1/04
[2003/49]
CPC:
G02B1/043 (EP,US); C08F8/12 (EP,US); C08F8/44 (EP,US);
C08F2810/20 (EP,US); C08F2810/50 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C08F8/12, C08F218/08 (US);
C08F8/12, C08F218/20 (US,EP);
C08F8/44, C08F8/12, C08F220/14 (US,EP);
G02B1/043, C08L29/02 (EP,US);
C08F218/08, C08F218/16, C08F216/125 (US,EP);
C08F218/20, C08F218/16, C08F216/125 (US,EP)
(-)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/35]
Former [2003/49]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Hochwasserabsorbierende ophtalmische Linse und Verfahren zur Herstellung davon[2003/49]
English:Highly water-absorptive ophthalmic lens and method of producing the same[2003/49]
French:Lentille ophtalmique à absorption d'eau élevée et procédé de sa fabrication[2003/49]
Examination procedure04.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/11]
01.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2005/11]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.07.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004BG   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004CZ   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004EE   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004HU   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004RO   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004SI   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004SK   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
13.07.2004M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP2000248003  ;
 [A]CN1304050  ;
 [A]NZ334977  ;
 [Y]WO9804934  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 4, paragraph 6 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 5 - page 9, paragraph 4 * * page 16, paragraph 3 - paragraph 5 * * page 17, paragraph 3 - page 19, paragraph 5; claims 1-10 *;
 [Y]EP0962511  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 7 - line 30 * * column 3, line 23 - line 40 * * column 5, line 39 - line 52; claims 1-8 *;
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 65, Database accession no. 2000-667405, XP002253709 & JP2000248003 A 20000912 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND CO) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 04, Database accession no. 2002-026793, XP002253710 & CN1304050 A 20010718 (SHANXI COAL CHEM ACAD SINICA) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 08, Database accession no. 2001-069031, XP002253711 & NZ334977 A 20000929 (NOVARTIS AG) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.