EP1375804 - In-floor, adjustable, multiple-configuration track assembly for sliding panels with built-in weep system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weiland, William R. 2042 Sheridan Encinitas California 92024 / US | For all designated states Ulibarri, Robert A. 8018 Sitio Caucho Carlsbad California 92009 / US | [2009/45] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Weiland, William R. 2042 Sheridan Encinitas, California 92024 / US | ||
For all designated states Ulibarri, Robert A. 8018 Sitio Caucho Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Duxbury, Stephen Arnold & Siedsma Bavariaring 17 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Duxbury, Stephen ARNOLD & SIEDSMA Pettenkoferstrasse 37 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/01] | Kremer, Simon Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03253596.5 | 06.06.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | US20020185942 | 27.06.2002 Original published format: US 185942 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1375804 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1375804 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1375804 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/06 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
E06B7/14 (EP,US);
E05D15/0686 (EP,US);
E06B3/4636 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | In den Boden einbaubare, justierbare Führungsschiene mit mehreren Konfigurationen, für Schiebeflügel mit eingebautem Wassersammlungs- und Feuchtigkeitsentfernungssystem | [2004/01] | English: | In-floor, adjustable, multiple-configuration track assembly for sliding panels with built-in weep system | [2004/01] | French: | Ensemble glissière, encastré dans le sol, réglable et à configurations multiples, pour panneaux coulissants avec système de drainage et d'évacuation de l'humidité intégré | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 04.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.11.2009 | BE | 04.11.2009 | CY | 04.11.2009 | CZ | 04.11.2009 | DK | 04.11.2009 | EE | 04.11.2009 | FI | 04.11.2009 | IT | 04.11.2009 | NL | 04.11.2009 | RO | 04.11.2009 | SE | 04.11.2009 | SI | 04.11.2009 | SK | 04.11.2009 | TR | 04.11.2009 | BG | 04.02.2010 | GR | 05.02.2010 | ES | 15.02.2010 | PT | 04.03.2010 | HU | 05.05.2010 | GB | 06.06.2010 | IE | 06.06.2010 | LU | 06.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | FR | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
NL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
GB | 06.06.2010 | ||
IE | 06.06.2010 | ||
LU | 06.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
GB | 06.06.2010 | ||
IE | 06.06.2010 | ||
LU | 06.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
GB | 06.06.2010 | ||
IE | 06.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
GB | 06.06.2010 | ||
IE | 06.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
IE | 06.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
IE | 06.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
IE | 06.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 04.11.2009 | |
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 04.11.2009 | |
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 15.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0828144 ; | [A]JPH05332068 ; | [A]GB824580 (QUICKTHO 1928 LTD) [A] 1,6-8,10-13,18* the whole document *; | [A]GB1063810 (DENIS EDWARD BARNES) [A] 1,6-13,16,18 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2653817 (KRIEG & ZIVY [FR]) [A] 1,6-8,10-16,18 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, & JP08028144 A 19960130 (SUMITOMO FORESTRY CO LTD) [A] 1,2,5-8,11,13,14,17,18 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940318), vol. 018, no. 164, Database accession no. (M - 1579), & JP05332068 A 19931214 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD; others: 01) [A] 1,5-8,10-14,18 * abstract * |