EP1372069 - Method system and software for configuring a graphics processing communication mode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATI Technologies Inc. One Commerce Valley Drive East Markham, ON L3T 7X6 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states ATI Technologies Inc. One Commerce Valley Drive East Markham, Ontario L3T 7X6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cheng, Jeffrey Gongxian 8 Oscar Court North York, Ontario M2K 2A4 / CA | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | Howe, Steven Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03253698.9 | 11.06.2003 | [2003/51] | Priority number, date | US20020388084P | 12.06.2002 Original published format: US 388084 P | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1372069 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1372069 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
G06F9/44505 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/02] |
Former [2003/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren, System und Software zur Konfigurierung eines grafikverarbeitenden Kommunikationsmodus | [2003/51] | English: | Method system and software for configuring a graphics processing communication mode | [2003/51] | French: | Méthode, système et logiciel pour configurer un mode de communication de traitement graphique | [2003/51] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/29] | 28.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.12.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.12.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5491804 (HEATH CHESTER A [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * column A ** column 1, lines 38-62 *; | [A]US6211891 (WAHLIG ELSIE D [US]) [A] 1-19 * column A * * column 7, line 3 - column 10, line 8 *; | [X]US6374352 (GOLDMAN TOMASZ J [DK], et al) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * column 4, lines 24-37 * * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 64 *; | [A] - NELSON R, "3DNow! MVP3 BIOS Guide", INTERNET ARTICLE, (19991012), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/19991012050719/http://3dnow.net/views/bios_mvp3.htm, (20060227), XP002370662 [A] 1-19 * page 3, paragraph L - page 4, paragraph 1 * |