blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1380759

EP1380759 - Stress defender holes in jointings [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.08.2008
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rolls-Royce plc
65 Buckingham Gate
London, SW1E 6AT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/42]For all designated states
ROLLS-ROYCE PLC
65 Buckingham Gate
London, SW1E 6AT / GB
Former [2004/03]For all designated states
ROLLS-ROYCE plc
65 Buckingham Gate
London, SW1E 6AT / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Wagner, Stefan Jochen
23 Nairn Close, Stenson Fields
Derby DE24 3LU / GB
 [2004/03]
Representative(s)Gunn, Michael Alan
Rolls-Royce plc Patents Department P.O. Box 31 Derby
DE24 8BJ / GB
[2009/40]
Former [2004/03]Gunn, Michael Alan
Rolls-Royce plc P.O. Box 31
Derby DE24 8BJ / GB
Application number, filing date03253758.113.06.2003
[2004/03]
Priority number, dateGB2002001636213.07.2002         Original published format: GB 0216362
[2004/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1380759
Date:14.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1380759
Date:17.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.2003
ClassificationIPC:F16B5/02, F01D5/30, F16B31/06, F01D5/06
[2004/03]
CPC:
F01D5/30 (EP,US); F01D5/066 (EP,US); F16B5/02 (EP,US);
F05D2250/232 (EP,US); F05D2250/292 (EP,US); Y10T403/75 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/41]
Former [2004/03]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Löcher zur Entlastung von Spannungen in Verbindungen[2004/03]
English:Stress defender holes in jointings[2004/03]
French:Trous pour détente de tension dans des fixations[2004/03]
Examination procedure27.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/05]
15.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2007Fee for grant paid
04.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
22.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4292376  (HUSTLER DAVID) [A] 6 * abstract * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 10; figures 2,3 *;
 [YA]US4887949  (DIMMICK III JOHN H [US], et al) [Y] 9 * column 1, line 12 - line 15; figures 1,2; claim 1 * [A] 1;
 [A]US5497616  (ROBERTS MARTYN G [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 130 - column 45 *;
 [XY]EP0905346  (SCHULTE SCHLAGBAUM AG [DE]) [X] 1-8,10-15 * abstract * [Y] 9;
 [T]  - BEITZ ET AL, Dubbel Taschenbuch für den Maschinenbau, BERLIN, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1987), XP002259193 [T] 6,11 * page E12 - page E15 *
ExaminationEP1304489
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.