Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1391738

EP1391738 - Probe card [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.05.2008
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2008Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.07.2008  [2008/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIHON DENSHIZAIRYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-5-13 Nishinagasu-cho Amagasaki-shi
Hyogo 660-0805 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/09]For all designated states
Nihon Denshizairyo Kabushiki Kaisha
2-5-13 Nishinagasu-cho
Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 660-0805 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Mori, Chikaomi
638-1, Oazaterajima, Yamaga-shi
Kumamoto-ken 861-0527 / JP
 [2004/09]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/09]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
Application number, filing date03254669.925.07.2003
[2004/09]
Priority number, dateJP2002023397909.08.2002         Original published format: JP 2002233979
[2004/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1391738
Date:25.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1391738
Date:09.11.2005
[2005/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:G01R1/073
[2004/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2006/28]
Former [2004/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Testsondenkarte[2004/09]
English:Probe card[2004/09]
French:Carte sonde[2004/09]
Examination procedure14.08.2003Examination requested  [2004/09]
02.01.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.2008Application withdrawn by applicant  [2008/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
19.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO0171779  (FORMFACTOR, INC; MATHIEU, GAETAN, L; ELDRIDGE, BENJAMIN, N; GRUBE, GAR) [X] 1-3,6 * figures 2,5A-5C * * page 4, line 33 - page 6, line 21 * * page 7, line 5 - line 11 * * page 8, line 3 - line 28 * [Y] 4,5,7;
 [X]WO0033096  (FORMFACTOR, INC) [X] 1-3 * figures 2,3 * * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 31 *;
 [A]WO02061442  (WENTWORTH LABORATORIES, INC) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,2 * * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 15 *;
 [A]US6078186  (HEMBREE ET AL) [A] 1-3 * figures 3,4 * * column 8, line 15 - line 50 *;
 [Y]US6130543  (IINO ET AL) [Y] 4,5,7 * figures 1-3 * * column 10, line 23 - line 27 *;
 [A]WO0045433  (TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED; IINO, SHINJI; HAGIHARA, JUNICHI; TAKEKOSHI, KI) [A] 1 * figures 2,5,7B *;
 [A]US5506498  (ANDERSON ET AL) [A] 1 * figures 7A,7B * * column 9, line 27 - line 34 *;
 [A]US5850148  (NAM ET AL) [A] 1 * figures 1,5 * * column 5, line 15 - line 25 *;
 [A]WO0101247  (TERADYNE, INC) [A] 1 * figure 6 *