blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1396471

EP1396471 - HYDROGEN GENERATING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/11]Hydrogen generating apparatus
[2018/17]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.09.2019
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intelligent Energy Limited
Charnwood Building
Holywell Park
Ashby Road
Loughborough
Leicestershire LE11 3GB / GB
[2018/42]
Former [2011/01]For all designated states
Eveready Battery Company, Inc.
533 Maryville University Drive
St Louis, MO 64141 / US
Former [2004/11]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
20555 S.H. 249
Houston, TX 77070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Devos, John A.
7440 NE Pettibone Drive
Corvallis, OR 97330 / US
 [2004/11]
Representative(s)Creation IP Ltd
Hillington Park Innovation Centre
1 Ainslie Road
Glasgow G52 4RU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/45]Ahmad, Sheikh Shakeel, et al
Keltie LLP
No.1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BA / GB
Former [2014/13]Ahmad, Sheikh Shakeel, et al
Keltie LLP
Fleet Place House
2 Fleet Place
London EC4M 7ET / GB
Former [2012/09]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Patentanwälte
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2011/01]Weber, Thomas, et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Former [2010/12]Rees, Simon John Lewis, et al
Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Former [2009/51]Jackson, Richard Eric, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2004/11]Jackson, Richard Eric, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date03255244.022.08.2003
[2004/11]
Priority number, dateUS2002023643006.09.2002         Original published format: US 236430
[2004/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1396471
Date:10.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1396471
Date:28.04.2004
[2004/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1396471
Date:07.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.2004
ClassificationIPC:C01B3/06, H01M8/06, B01J14/00, B01J7/02
[2004/11]
CPC:
C01B3/065 (EP,US); C01B3/16 (KR); B01J14/005 (EP,US);
B01J7/02 (EP,US); F17C11/005 (EP,US); H01M8/065 (EP,US);
H01M8/04201 (EP,US); H01M8/04208 (EP,US); Y02E60/32 (EP,US);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US); Y02E60/50 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2018/45]
Former [2005/03]DE,  FR,  GB,  NL 
Former [2004/11]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON WASSERSTOFF[2018/17]
English:HYDROGEN GENERATING APPARATUS[2018/17]
French:DISPOSITIF DE GÉNERATION D'HYDROGÈNE[2018/17]
Former [2004/11]Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung von Wasserstoff
Former [2004/11]Hydrogen generating apparatus
Former [2004/11]Dispositif de géneration d hydrogène
Examination procedure06.10.2004Examination requested  [2004/49]
02.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.2018Fee for grant paid
03.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.02.2005
Opposition(s)08.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
25.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
25.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
27.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 16
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL07.11.2018
[2019/24]
Documents cited:Search[X]DE1667346  (VARTA AG) [X] 1,8 * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]WO0151410  (MILLENNIUM CELL LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * page 22, line 19 - page 23, line 2; figure 3; claim - *;
 [X]WO0174710  (MANHATTAN SCIENTIFICS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,8-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1170249  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5,6,8,10* claim - *;
 [X]WO0230810  (MANHATTAN SCIENTIFICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10 * page 8, line 30 - page 11, line 15 *
ExaminationEP1375419
by applicantWO0151410
 WO0174710
 WO0230810
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.