Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1398006

EP1398006 - Duo-fixation prosthetic joints [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  17.04.2009
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2009Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 20.05.2009  [2009/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DePuy Products, Inc.
700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw
Indiana 46581 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/12]For all designated states
Depuy Products, Inc.
700 Orthopaedic Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Haas, Brian
3, Covington Drive
Engelwood, Colorada / US
 [2004/12]
Representative(s)Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/12]Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower North Central Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date03255591.409.09.2003
[2004/12]
Priority number, dateUS20020409262P09.09.2002         Original published format: US 409262 P
US2003064208815.08.2003         Original published format: US 642088
[2004/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1398006
Date:17.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1398006
Date:19.01.2005
[2005/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/30, A61F2/38
[2004/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/12]
TitleGerman:Gelenkprothese mit doppelter Befestigung[2004/12]
English:Duo-fixation prosthetic joints[2004/12]
French:Articulation prothétique avec double fixation[2004/12]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/36]
01.04.2009Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0910999  (JOHNSON & JOHNSON PROFESSIONAL) [X] 1,10,20,29,38 * column 4, line 13 - line 18; figure 6 * * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 5 *;
 [A]DE4441178  (SCHMIDT RAMSIN ECKHARD DR MED) [A] 1 * column 5, line 15 - line 22; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP1013241  (JOHNSON & JOHNSON PROFESSIONAL) [A] 1 * column 4, line 8 - line 20 *;
 [A]GB2251795  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) [A] 1 * page 5, line 21 - line 31 *;
 [A]US5725592  (ENZERINK ROBERT-JAN ET AL) [A] 1 * column 7, line 35 - line 40 *;
 [A]WO8302555  (US MEDICAL CORP) [A] 1 * page 33, line 2 - line 21; figure 20 *;
 [A]WO9302641  (JOINT MEDICAL PRODUCTS CORP) [A] 1 * page 7, line 8 - page 8, line 2 * * page 11, line 32 *;
 [DA]US4790852  (NOILES DOUGLAS G) [DA] 1 * abstract *