Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1398948

EP1398948 - Image forming apparatus, methods used therein and a computer readable storage medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2014
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2014No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.10.2014  [2014/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
[2013/45]
Former [2004/12]For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Akiyoshi, Kunihiro
387-7, Yoda
Zendoujimachi
Kurume-shi Fukuoka / JP
02 / Tanaka, Hiroyuki
2-148, Mikunigaoka
Ogoori-shi Fukuoka / JP
03 / Ando, Mitsuo
703-701, Nonakamachi
Kurume-shi Fukuoka / JP
 [2013/45]
Former [2004/26]01 / Akiyoshi, Kunihiro
387-7, Yoda Zendoujimachi
Kurume-shi Fukuoka / JP
02 / Tanaka, Hiroyuki
2-148, Mikunigaoka
Ogoori-shi Fukuoka / JP
03 / Ando, Mitsuo
703-701, Nonakamachi
Kurume-shi Fukuoka / JP
Former [2004/12]01 / Akiyoshi, Kunihiro
387-7, Yoda Zendoujimachi
Kurume-shi Fukuoka / JP
02 / Tanaka, Hiroyuku
2-148, Mikunigaoka
Ogoori-shi Fukuoka / JP
03 / Ando, Mitsuo
703-701, Nonakamachi
Kurume-shi Fukuoka / JP
Representative(s)Leeming, John Gerard
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2013/45]
Former [2004/12]Leeming, John Gerard
J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date03255730.812.09.2003
[2004/12]
Priority number, dateJP2002026928013.09.2002         Original published format: JP 2002269280
JP2002026928113.09.2002         Original published format: JP 2002269281
JP2002026928213.09.2002         Original published format: JP 2002269282
JP2002030763614.09.2002         Original published format: JP 2002307636
JP2002030763714.09.2002         Original published format: JP 2002307637
JP2003031728009.09.2003         Original published format: JP 2003317280
JP2003031728109.09.2003         Original published format: JP 2003317281
JP2003031728209.09.2003         Original published format: JP 2003317282
JP2003031728309.09.2003         Original published format: JP 2003317283
[2004/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1398948
Date:17.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1398948
Date:26.10.2005
[2005/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1398948
Date:06.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/10
[2005/33]
Former International [2004/12]H04N1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2006/27]
Former [2004/12]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bilderzeugungsgerät, Verfahren dafür und Computerlesbares Speichermedium[2004/12]
English:Image forming apparatus, methods used therein and a computer readable storage medium[2004/12]
French:Appareil de formation d'images, méthodes utilisées dedans et support de stockage lisible sur ordinateur[2004/12]
Examination procedure25.09.2003Examination requested  [2004/12]
10.02.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2013Date of oral proceedings
14.06.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2013Fee for grant paid
06.09.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.03.2006
Opposition(s)07.08.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
22.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
20.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
20.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES06.11.2013
IT06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
[2014/38]
Former [2014/24]ES06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
Former [2014/22]NL06.11.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]JP2002166628  ;
 [YA]US5630076  (SAULPAUGH THOMAS E [US], et al) [Y] 5-7,19-21 * abstract * * claim 3 * [A] 8-14;
 [XY]US5412798  (GARNEY JOHN I [US]) [X] 49,52-55,57,59,62,65-68,70,72 * abstract * * figure 10 * * column 2, lines 5-49 * * column 7, lines 12-29 * * column 14, line 57 - column 15, line 38 * * claim 1 * [Y] 50,51,60,61,63,64,73,74;
 [YA]US2002129353  (WILLIAMS BRETT [US], et al) [Y] 75,76,79,86-89,92,99,100 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0013] , [0014] * [A] 49-53,59-66,72-74;
 [X]WO9955534  (LEXMARK INT INC [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0858022  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US6091508  (LOVE SHAUN TIMOTHY [US], et al) [A] 49 * abstract * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 20 * * column 7, lines 18-28 * * column 9, line 50 - column 10, line 32 *;
 [A]US6138178  (WATANABE MIKIO [JP]) [A] 27-41 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0576305  (LEXMARK INT INC [US]) [A] * abstract *;
 [A]JPH11353136
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021010), vol. 2002, no. 10, & JP2002166628 A 20020611 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-4,8-18,22-48,101,102 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] * * paragraphs [0020] , [0025] , [0028] * * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] , [0034] * * paragraphs [0044] - [0052] * * paragraphs [0060] , [0061] , [0081] * * figure 3 * [Y] 5-7,19-21,50,51,60,61,63,64,73-76,79,86-89,92,99,100
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000330), vol. 2000, no. 03, & JP11353136 A 19991224 (CANON INC) [A] * abstract *
by applicantJP2002166628
 US5630076