Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1416425

EP1416425 - System and method for detecting a face [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.08.2008
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416, Maetan-dong
Paldal-gu
Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR
[N/P]
Former [2007/43]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR
Former [2004/19]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Yoon, Sang-min, c/o Dormitory Room C-414
Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology
Giheung-eup Yongin-city Kyungki-do / KR
02 / Kee, Seok-cheol
104-701 Samsung APT Giheung-eup
Yongin-city Kyungki-do / KR
 [2004/19]
Representative(s)Anderson, James Edward George
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/18]Anderson, James Edward George
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2004/19]Greene, Simon Kenneth
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date03256953.504.11.2003
[2004/19]
Priority number, dateKR2002006797404.11.2002         Original published format: KR 2002067974
[2004/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1416425
Date:06.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1416425
Date:24.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP26.02.2004
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00
[2004/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/04]
Former [2004/19]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Gesichtserkennung[2004/19]
English:System and method for detecting a face[2004/19]
French:Appareil et procédé de détection d'un visage[2007/20]
Former [2004/19]Appareil et procédé de détection d'une visage
Examination procedure04.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/41]
04.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.04.2007
30.03.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
10.04.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
26.04.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2007Fee for grant paid
05.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
01.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]  KIM T-K ET AL, "COMPONENT-BASED LDA FACE DESCRIPTOR FOR IMAGE RETRIEVAL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE BRITISH MACHINE VISION CONFERENCE, XX, XX, (20020902), pages 507 - 516, XP008023183 [X] 1-7,10-13,15,16,19 * abstract * * page 508, paragraph 6 - page 510, paragraph 4 * * page 512, paragraph 3 - paragraph 5 * * page 513, paragraph 4 * [Y] 14,20
 [YA]  D. OZIEM, "Face Recognition Techniques and the Implications of Facial Transformations", BACHELOR DISSERTATION, COMPUTER SCIENCE DEPARTMENT, UNIVERSITY OF BRISTOL, UK, (200205), pages 17 - 34, XP002270115 [Y] 20 * page 32; figures 10,11 * [A] 4-6,12,15,16
 [Y]  MOTA G A ET AL, "Face detector combining eigenfaces, neural network and bootstrap", PROC. BRAZILIAN SYMPOSIUM ON NEURAL NETWORKS, SBRN 2000, (20001122), pages 290 - 290, XP010527597 [Y] 14 * page 290, column L, paragraph 5 *
 [A]  KIM H-C ET AL, "Face recognition using the mixture-of-eigenfaces method", PATTERN RECOGNITION LETTERS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBL. AMSTERDAM, NL, (200211), vol. 23, no. 13, ISSN 0167-8655, pages 1549 - 1558, XP004360420 [A] 1,11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-8655(02)00119-8
 [A]  MARTINEZ A M ET AL, "PCA VERSUS LDA", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200102), vol. 23, no. 2, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 228 - 233, XP001170330 [A] 1,11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.908974