Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1418513

EP1418513 - CAD apparatus, method, program and medium storing the programm, for designing a wiring path [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.04.2010
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YAZAKI CORPORATION
4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8333 / JP
[2007/22]
Former [2004/20]For all designated states
Yazaki Corporation
4-28 Mita 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tsuchiya, Shinji, Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd.
2464-48 Washizu
Kosai-shi Shizuoka / JP
02 / Nagakura, Kohki, Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd.
2464-48 Washizu
Kosai-shi Shizuoka / JP
03 / Hasegawa, Takeshi, Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd.
2464-48 Washizu
Kosai-shi Shizuoka / JP
 [2004/20]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/02]Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Former [2004/20]Brunner, Michael John
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date03257060.807.11.2003
[2004/20]
Priority number, dateJP2002032553408.11.2002         Original published format: JP 2002325534
JP2003031429605.09.2003         Original published format: JP 2003314296
[2004/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1418513
Date:12.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1418513
Date:18.01.2006
[2006/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/50
[2004/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/38]
Former [2004/20]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:CAD Vorrichtung, Verfahren, Programm und Speichermedium zum Entwurf eines Leitungsführung[2004/20]
English:CAD apparatus, method, program and medium storing the programm, for designing a wiring path[2004/20]
French:Appareil, méthode, programme et dispositif de stockage CAD pour la conception d'un chemin de cablage[2004/20]
Examination procedure06.07.2006Examination requested  [2006/33]
10.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
04.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
04.03.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination04.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1371/16
17.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.12.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
15.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
12.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
13.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
18.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
10.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 16
14.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 17
Documents cited:Search[A]US6457165  (ISHIKAWA TAKESHI ET AL) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - ALIBOZEK T, "SMART SOFTWARE BUILDS A BETTER HARNESS", MACHINE DESIGN, PENTON MEDIA, CLEVELAND, OH, US, (19980507), vol. 70, no. 8, ISSN 0024-9114, pages 89 - 92, XP001092826 [X] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [A]  - WU Y ET AL, "USE OF THE EXPERT SYSTEM AS A DESIGN TOOL FOR THE CABLE HARNESS DESIGN", APPLICATIONS OF ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE IN ENGINEERING. PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, (19920714), pages 357 - 372, XP008042313 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicant   - "Smart Software Builds a Better Harness", MACHINE DESIGN, vol. 70, no. 8, pages 89 - 90