Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1427006

EP1427006 - Electronic parts packaging structure and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.09.2009
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.10.2009  [2009/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHINKO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO., LTD.
80 Oshimada-machi
Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2004/24]For all designated states
Shinko Electric Industries Co., Ltd.
80 Oshimada-machi
Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sunohara, Masahiro
c/o Shinko El. Ind. Co.,Ltd. 80, Oshimada-machi
Nagano-shi Nagano 381-2287 / JP
02 / Murayama, Kei
c/o Shinko El. Ind. Co.,Ltd. 80, Oshimada-machi
Nagano-shi Nagano 381-2287 / JP
03 / Mashino, Naohiro
c/o Shinko El. Ind. Co.,Ltd. 80, Oshimada-machi
Nagano-shi Nagano 381-2287 / JP
04 / Higashi, Mitsutoshi
c/o Shinko El. Ind. Co.,Ltd. 80, Oshimada-machi
Nagano-shi Nagano 381-2287 / JP
 [2004/24]
Representative(s)Fenlon, Christine Lesley
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/24]Fenlon, Christine Lesley
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date03257626.603.12.2003
[2004/24]
Priority number, dateJP2002035152603.12.2002         Original published format: JP 2002351526
[2004/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1427006
Date:09.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1427006
Date:19.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/48, H01L23/48, H01L25/065, H01L21/768, H01L23/538
[2004/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2005/09]
Former [2004/24]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verpackungsstruktur für elektronische Bauteile und Methode zu deren Herstellung[2004/24]
English:Electronic parts packaging structure and method of manufacturing the same[2004/24]
French:Structure d'encapsulation pour éléments électroniques et méthode pour sa fabrication[2004/24]
Examination procedure07.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/37]
19.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.08.2008Fee for grant paid
28.08.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.08.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002127839  (AMAKO JUN ET AL) [X] 1-8,10,13-15 * paragraphs [0114] - [0121] - [0143] , [0144] , [0153] , [0178]; figures 1-4,10 *;
 [A]EP1248295  (SHINKO ELEC IND) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0022] - [0033]; figures 2-7 *;
 [A]US2002160598  (KONG SIK ON) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0023]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2001008794  (AKAGAWA MASATOSHI) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2001004130  (SAKAGUCHI HIDEAKI ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *