blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1426073

EP1426073 - Catheter with extendable track [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.05.2009
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 01.12.2010  [2010/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati, OH 45242-2839 / US
[2004/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Long, Gary L.
15 Donnay Close Gerrards Cross
Buckinghamshire SL9 7PZ / GB
 [2004/24]
Representative(s)Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/24]Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date03257645.604.12.2003
[2004/24]
Priority number, dateUS2002031036505.12.2002         Original published format: US 310365
US2003040602003.04.2003         Original published format: US 406020
[2004/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1426073
Date:09.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1426073
Date:25.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.04.2004
ClassificationIPC:A61M25/01, A61B1/05, A61B1/00
[2004/24]
CPC:
A61B1/31 (EP,US); A61B1/00133 (EP,US); A61B1/00156 (EP,US);
A61B1/018 (EP,US); A61B1/041 (EP,US); A61B1/05 (EP,US);
A61M25/0105 (EP,US); A61M25/0113 (EP,US); A61M25/0116 (EP,US);
A61M2210/1042 (EP,US); A61M2210/106 (EP,US); A61M2210/1064 (EP,US);
A61M2210/1067 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/24]
TitleGerman:Katheter mit ausziehbarer Spur[2004/24]
English:Catheter with extendable track[2004/24]
French:Catheter avec un rail extensible[2004/24]
Examination procedure19.11.2004Examination requested  [2005/03]
02.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.02.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.2008Fee for grant paid
02.05.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.06.2008
BE25.06.2008
CY25.06.2008
CZ25.06.2008
DK25.06.2008
EE25.06.2008
FI25.06.2008
NL25.06.2008
RO25.06.2008
SI25.06.2008
SK25.06.2008
TR25.06.2008
BG25.09.2008
SE25.09.2008
GR26.09.2008
ES06.10.2008
PT25.11.2008
IE04.12.2008
LU04.12.2008
HU26.12.2008
CH31.12.2008
LI31.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
[2010/48]
Former [2010/37]AT25.06.2008
BE25.06.2008
CY25.06.2008
CZ25.06.2008
DK25.06.2008
EE25.06.2008
FI25.06.2008
NL25.06.2008
RO25.06.2008
SI25.06.2008
SK25.06.2008
TR25.06.2008
BG25.09.2008
SE25.09.2008
ES06.10.2008
PT25.11.2008
IE04.12.2008
LU04.12.2008
HU26.12.2008
CH31.12.2008
LI31.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2010/34]AT25.06.2008
BE25.06.2008
CY25.06.2008
CZ25.06.2008
DK25.06.2008
EE25.06.2008
FI25.06.2008
NL25.06.2008
RO25.06.2008
SI25.06.2008
SK25.06.2008
BG25.09.2008
SE25.09.2008
ES06.10.2008
PT25.11.2008
IE04.12.2008
LU04.12.2008
HU26.12.2008
CH31.12.2008
LI31.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2010/32]AT25.06.2008
BE25.06.2008
CZ25.06.2008
DK25.06.2008
EE25.06.2008
FI25.06.2008
NL25.06.2008
RO25.06.2008
SI25.06.2008
SK25.06.2008
BG25.09.2008
SE25.09.2008
ES06.10.2008
PT25.11.2008
IE04.12.2008
LU04.12.2008
CH31.12.2008
LI31.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2009/47]AT25.06.2008
BE25.06.2008
CZ25.06.2008
DK25.06.2008
EE25.06.2008
FI25.06.2008
NL25.06.2008
RO25.06.2008
SI25.06.2008
SK25.06.2008
BG25.09.2008
SE25.09.2008
ES06.10.2008
PT25.11.2008
IE04.12.2008
CH31.12.2008
LI31.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2009/34]AT25.06.2008
BE25.06.2008
CZ25.06.2008
DK25.06.2008
EE25.06.2008
FI25.06.2008
NL25.06.2008
RO25.06.2008
SI25.06.2008
SK25.06.2008
BG25.09.2008
SE25.09.2008
ES06.10.2008
PT25.11.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2009/23]AT25.06.2008
BE25.06.2008
CZ25.06.2008
DK25.06.2008
EE25.06.2008
FI25.06.2008
NL25.06.2008
RO25.06.2008
SI25.06.2008
SK25.06.2008
BG25.09.2008
SE25.09.2008
ES06.10.2008
PT25.11.2008
Former [2009/22]AT25.06.2008
BE25.06.2008
CZ25.06.2008
DK25.06.2008
EE25.06.2008
FI25.06.2008
NL25.06.2008
RO25.06.2008
SI25.06.2008
SK25.06.2008
SE25.09.2008
ES06.10.2008
PT25.11.2008
Former [2009/20]AT25.06.2008
BE25.06.2008
CZ25.06.2008
DK25.06.2008
FI25.06.2008
NL25.06.2008
RO25.06.2008
SI25.06.2008
SK25.06.2008
SE25.09.2008
ES06.10.2008
PT25.11.2008
Former [2009/14]AT25.06.2008
BE25.06.2008
CZ25.06.2008
FI25.06.2008
NL25.06.2008
RO25.06.2008
SI25.06.2008
SK25.06.2008
SE25.09.2008
ES06.10.2008
PT25.11.2008
Former [2009/12]AT25.06.2008
BE25.06.2008
CZ25.06.2008
FI25.06.2008
NL25.06.2008
SI25.06.2008
SE25.09.2008
ES06.10.2008
PT25.11.2008
Former [2009/09]AT25.06.2008
FI25.06.2008
NL25.06.2008
SI25.06.2008
SE25.09.2008
ES06.10.2008
PT25.11.2008
Former [2009/07]AT25.06.2008
FI25.06.2008
NL25.06.2008
SI25.06.2008
SE25.09.2008
Former [2009/01]AT25.06.2008
FI25.06.2008
NL25.06.2008
SI25.06.2008
Former [2008/50]AT25.06.2008
FI25.06.2008
SI25.06.2008
Former [2008/48]SI25.06.2008
Documents cited:Search[A]US5643175  (ADAIR EDWIN L [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [XA]US5895417  (POMERANZ MARK L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 35; figures 1,6,8 * * column 7, line 55 - column 8, line 25 * [A] 4-7,9,10;
 [A]US5984860  (SHAN YANSONG [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6036636  (MOTOKI NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* column 4, line 55 - column 10, line 47; figures 3-17 *;
 [X]US6190382  (ORMSBY THEODORE C [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract *;
 [X]US6454758  (THOMPSON RUSSELL B [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 8, line 18 - column 10, line 42 * * column 15, line 29 - column 18, line 30 * * column 25, line 20 - column 25, line 43 * * column 30, line 54 - column 30, line 67 * * column 38, line 11 - column 38, line 38; figures 1-3,16-20,25-31,42,53,54,83 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.