Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1359082

EP1359082 - Position adjustment device of a motor vehicle steering column [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  23.01.2009
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NACAM France S.A.
Z.I. Sud-Route de Blois
41000 Vendome / FR
[2009/09]
Former [2003/45]For all designated states
NACAM FRANCE S.A.
Z.I. Sud-Route de Blois
41000 Vendome / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Gauchenot, Benjamin
1 Rue Munier
41000 Blois / FR
02 / Sauquet, Mickael
17 Chemin des Vignes
41100 Saint Ouen / FR
 [2003/45]
Representative(s)Gevers & Orès
41 avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]Cabinet Martinet & Lapoux
BP 405
78055 Saint Quentin Yvelines Cédex / FR
Former [2003/45]Cabinet Martinet & Lapoux
43, Boulevard Vauban, B.P. 405, Guyancourt
78055 St. Quentin Yvelines Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date03290739.624.03.2003
[2003/45]
Priority number, dateFR2002000559229.04.2002         Original published format: FR 0205592
[2003/45]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1359082
Date:05.11.2003
Language:FR
[2003/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1359082
Date:03.11.2004
Language:FR
[2004/45]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1359082
Date:25.02.2009
Language:FR
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:B62D1/184
[2003/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/45]
TitleGerman:Positionsanpassungseinrichtung einer einstellbaren Kraftfahrzeuglenksäule[2003/45]
English:Position adjustment device of a motor vehicle steering column[2003/45]
French:Dispositif d'ajustement de position d'une colonne de direction réglable de véhicule automobile[2003/45]
Examination procedure08.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/02]
19.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.08.2004Fee for grant paid
28.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.07.2005  17.08.2005  ADMISSIBLE
ThyssenKrupp Presta Aktiengesellschaft
Essanestrasse 10
9492 Eschen / LI
Opponent's representative
Hofmann, Ralf U., et al
Hofmann & Fechner
Patentanwälte
Hörnlingerstrasse 3
Postfach 5
6830 Rankweil / AT
 [N/P]
Former [2009/47]
Opponent(s)01  28.07.2005  17.08.2005  ADMISSIBLE
ThyssenKrupp Presta Aktiengesellschaft
Essanestrasse 10
9492 Eschen / LI
Opponent's representative
Hofmann, Ralf U., et al
Hefel & Hofmann, Patentanwälte, Egelseestrasse 65a
6806 Feldkirch / AT
Former [2005/38]
Opponent(s)01  28.07.2005   
ThyssenKrupp Presta Ag
Essanestrasse
9492 Eschen / LI
Opponent's representative
Hofmann, Ralf U., et al
Hefel & Hofmann, Patentanwälte, Egelseestrasse 65a
6806 Feldkirch / AT
08.09.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.03.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.2007Reply to a communication from the opposition division
01.04.2008Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
01.04.2008Date of oral proceedings
06.05.2008Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.05.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.09.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
27.12.2008Fee for printing new specification paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.11.2004
BG03.11.2004
CZ03.11.2004
EE03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
IE03.11.2004
NL03.11.2004
RO03.11.2004
SI03.11.2004
SK03.11.2004
TR03.11.2004
DK03.02.2005
GR03.02.2005
SE03.02.2005
HU04.02.2005
CY24.03.2005
LU24.03.2005
BE31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
PT03.04.2005
FR30.11.2005
CH31.03.2007
LI31.03.2007
[2008/13]
Former [2008/04]AT03.11.2004
BG03.11.2004
CZ03.11.2004
EE03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
IE03.11.2004
NL03.11.2004
RO03.11.2004
SI03.11.2004
SK03.11.2004
TR03.11.2004
DK03.02.2005
GR03.02.2005
SE03.02.2005
HU04.02.2005
CY24.03.2005
LU24.03.2005
BE31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
PT03.04.2005
FR30.11.2005
Former [2007/41]AT03.11.2004
BG03.11.2004
CZ03.11.2004
EE03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
IE03.11.2004
NL03.11.2004
RO03.11.2004
SI03.11.2004
SK03.11.2004
TR03.11.2004
DK03.02.2005
GR03.02.2005
SE03.02.2005
HU04.02.2005
CY24.03.2005
LU24.03.2005
BE31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
FR30.11.2005
Former [2007/26]AT03.11.2004
BG03.11.2004
CZ03.11.2004
EE03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
IE03.11.2004
NL03.11.2004
SI03.11.2004
SK03.11.2004
TR03.11.2004
DK03.02.2005
GR03.02.2005
SE03.02.2005
HU04.02.2005
CY24.03.2005
LU24.03.2005
BE31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
FR30.11.2005
Former [2007/20]AT03.11.2004
BG03.11.2004
CZ03.11.2004
EE03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
IE03.11.2004
NL03.11.2004
SI03.11.2004
SK03.11.2004
TR03.11.2004
DK03.02.2005
GR03.02.2005
SE03.02.2005
HU04.02.2005
CY24.03.2005
BE31.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
FR30.11.2005
Former [2007/13]AT03.11.2004
BG03.11.2004
CZ03.11.2004
EE03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
IE03.11.2004
NL03.11.2004
SI03.11.2004
SK03.11.2004
TR03.11.2004
DK03.02.2005
GR03.02.2005
SE03.02.2005
HU04.02.2005
BE31.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
FR30.11.2005
Former [2006/52]AT03.11.2004
BG03.11.2004
CZ03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
IE03.11.2004
NL03.11.2004
SI03.11.2004
SK03.11.2004
TR03.11.2004
DK03.02.2005
GR03.02.2005
HU04.02.2005
BE31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
FR30.11.2005
Former [2006/35]AT03.11.2004
BG03.11.2004
CZ03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
IE03.11.2004
NL03.11.2004
SI03.11.2004
SK03.11.2004
DK03.02.2005
GR03.02.2005
HU04.02.2005
BE31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
FR30.11.2005
Former [2006/14]AT03.11.2004
BG03.11.2004
CZ03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
IE03.11.2004
NL03.11.2004
SI03.11.2004
SK03.11.2004
DK03.02.2005
GR03.02.2005
BE31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
FR30.11.2005
Former [2006/13]AT03.11.2004
BG03.11.2004
CZ03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
IE03.11.2004
NL03.11.2004
SI03.11.2004
SK03.11.2004
DK03.02.2005
GR03.02.2005
BE31.03.2005
Former [2005/50]AT03.11.2004
BG03.11.2004
CZ03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
IE03.11.2004
SI03.11.2004
SK03.11.2004
DK03.02.2005
GR03.02.2005
Former [2005/48]AT03.11.2004
BG03.11.2004
CZ03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
IE03.11.2004
SK03.11.2004
DK03.02.2005
GR03.02.2005
Former [2005/46]AT03.11.2004
BG03.11.2004
CZ03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
IE03.11.2004
DK03.02.2005
GR03.02.2005
Former [2005/36]AT03.11.2004
BG03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
GR03.02.2005
Former [2005/30]BG03.11.2004
FI03.11.2004
GR03.02.2005
Former [2005/26]FI03.11.2004
GR03.02.2005
Former [2005/24]FI03.11.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0836981  (SUPERVIS ETS [LI]) [A] 1,2,4,6,7 * column 1, line 47 - column 3, line 37; figure - *;
 [A]EP1170194  (KRUPP PRESTA AG [LI]) [A] 1-4,6-8 * paragraphs [0006] , [0010] - [0020]; figures 1-6 *
OppositionEP0836981
 WO0181149
 DE10031721
 EP0341078
 FR2787842