Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1367166

EP1367166 - Movable carriage at the entrance to a cross lapper and cross lapper equipped with such a carriage [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.11.2011
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Change - applicantpublished on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Andritz Asselin-Thibeau
41, rue Camille Randoing
76500 Elbeuf / FR
[2019/40]
Former [2007/26]For all designated states
Asselin-Thibeau
191 Rue des Cinq Voies
59200 Tourcoing / FR
Former [2003/49]For all designated states
ASSELIN
41, rue Camille Randoing
F-76500 Elbeuf / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Louis, François
23 rue Frédéric Raux
27370 La Saussaye / FR
02 / Leroy, Hugues
Rés. Victoria, 2 rue Martin Frères
76000 Rouen / FR
03 / Lebloas, Didier
8 rue de L'oison
27370 Thoit Signol / FR
 [2003/49]
Representative(s)Eidelsberg, Olivier Nathan , et al
Cabinet Flechner
22, avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/31]Pontet Allano & Associes
Parc Orsay Université
25, rue Jean-Rostand
91893 Orsay Cedex / FR
Former [2011/51]Pontet, Bernard
Pontet Allano & Associés s.e.l.a.r.l. 25, Rue Jean Rostand Parc Club Orsay Université
91893 Orsay Cedex / FR
Former [2008/38]Pontet, Bernard
Pontet Allano & Associés s.e.l.a.r.l. 25, rue Jean-Rostand Parc Club Orsay Université
91893 Orsay Cedex / FR
Former [2003/49]Pontet, Bernard
Pontet Allano & Associés S.E.L.A.R.L. 25, rue Jean-Rostand Parc Club Orsay Université
91893 Orsay Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date03291166.120.05.2003
[2003/49]
Priority number, dateFR2002000646928.05.2002         Original published format: FR 0206469
[2003/49]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1367166
Date:03.12.2003
Language:FR
[2003/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1367166
Date:21.12.2011
Language:FR
[2011/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:D04H1/74, D01G25/00
[2003/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/49]
TitleGerman:Mobiler Transportwagen beim Eintritt zum Vliesleger und Vliesleger ausgerüstet mit einem solchen Transportwagen[2003/49]
English:Movable carriage at the entrance to a cross lapper and cross lapper equipped with such a carriage[2003/49]
French:Chariot mobile d'entrée d'étaleur-nappeur et étaleur-nappeur équipé dudit chariot[2003/49]
Examination procedure28.05.2004Examination requested  [2004/31]
05.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.11.2011Fee for grant paid
07.11.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.02.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.09.2012  19.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Oskar Dilo Maschinenfabrik KG
Im Hohenend 11
69412 Eberbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Wächter, Jochen, et al
Kroher-Strobel
Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB
Bavariaring 20
80336 München / DE
 02  21.09.2012  27.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
AUTEFA Solutions Germany GmbH
Paul-Lenz-Str. 1
86316 Friedberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Ernicke, Klaus Stefan, et al
ERNICKE Patent-und Rechtsanwälte
Beim Glaspalast 1
86153 Augsburg / DE
 [2018/27]
Former [2012/44]
Opponent(s)01  13.09.2012  19.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Oskar Dilo Maschinenfabrik KG
Im Hohenend 11
69412 Eberbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Wächter, Jochen, et al
Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20
80336 München / DE
 02  21.09.2012  27.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
AUTEFA Solutions Germany GmbH
Paul-Lenz-Str. 1
86316 Friedberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Ernicke, Klaus Stefan, et al
Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke, Schwibbogenplatz 2b
86153 Augsburg / DE
Former [2012/43]
Opponent(s)01  13.09.2012  19.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Oskar Dilo Maschinenfabrik KG
Im Hohenend 11
69412 Eberbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Wächter, Jochen, et al
Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20
80336 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
31.10.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.04.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
30.10.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.10.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition08.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0034/16
02.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
07.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0034/16
25.02.2016Statement of grounds filed
18.04.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2019/16]
17.06.2019Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2019/25]
11.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
21.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
23.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.05.2003
CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
TR21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
PT23.04.2012
GB20.05.2012
LU20.05.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
TR21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
PT23.04.2012
GB20.05.2012
LU20.05.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2014/21]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
TR21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
PT23.04.2012
GB20.05.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/29]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
PT23.04.2012
GB20.05.2012
BE31.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2012/37]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
PT23.04.2012
Former [2012/36]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
Former [2012/35]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
Former [2012/34]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
GR22.03.2012
Former [2012/28]CY21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
GR22.03.2012
Former [2012/24]NL21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
GR22.03.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]US4809404  (LASENGA WERNER) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6050469  (DUPONT JEAN-LOUIS ET AL) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]EP0517563  (ASSELIN ETS)