blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1426459

EP1426459 - Machine structural steel, process for thermoforming a piece made of this steel and piece produced by this process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.09.2016
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.11.2016  [2016/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASCO Industries
Avenue de France
57300 Hagondange / FR
[2015/46]
Former [2004/24]For all designated states
Ascometal
Immeuble "Le Colisée", 10 avenue de l' Arche, Faubourg de l' Arche
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Robelet, Marc
19 rue d'Auvergne
57190 Florange / FR
 [2004/24]
Representative(s)Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Neyret, Daniel Jean Marie, et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2004/24]Neyret, Daniel, et al
c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date03292974.728.11.2003
[2004/24]
Priority number, dateFR2002001537805.12.2002         Original published format: FR 0215378
[2004/24]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1426459
Date:09.06.2004
Language:FR
[2004/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.2004
ClassificationIPC:C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/42, C22C38/44, B22D17/00
[2004/24]
CPC:
C22C38/02 (EP,US); B22D17/007 (EP,US); C21D7/13 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US); C22C38/42 (EP,US); C22C38/44 (EP,US);
C22C38/60 (EP,US); C21D2281/00 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/24]
TitleGerman:Machinenbaustahl, Verfahren zum Warmumformen eines Werkstückes aus diesem Stahl und nach diesem Verfahren hergestelltes Werkstück[2004/24]
English:Machine structural steel, process for thermoforming a piece made of this steel and piece produced by this process[2004/24]
French:Acier pour construction mécanique, procédé de mise en forme à chaud d'une pièce de cet acier et piéce ainsi obtenue[2004/24]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.2004Examination requested  [2004/50]
15.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/44]
29.06.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/44]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.12.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
17.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
17.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
16.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
22.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
21.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
25.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
27.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201513   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2001123242  ;
 [A]US5667605  (BELLUS JACQUES [FR], et al) [A] 1-5 * claims 1-11 * * column 2, line 8 - column 4, line 16 *;
 [A]WO9803686  (UNIV MELBOURNE [AU], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 1, line 1 - page 17, line 26 *;
 [X]EP0864662  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * claims 1-16 * * examples I-V *;
 [X]DE19938936  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * claims 1-9 * * page 2, line 20 - page 5, line 64 * * examples I-III *;
 [X]GB2345699  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * claims 1-6 * * page 17, line 20 - page 41, line 6 *;
 [A]WO0159170  (AICHI STEEL WORKS LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * tables 1-17 *;
 [X]US6332938  (SUGAWARA TAKESHI [JP]) [X] 1-5 * claims 1-4 * * column 1, line 1 - column 5, line 58 *;
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010309), vol. 2000, no. 22, & JP2001123242 A 20010508 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract *
 [A]  - MEUSER H ET AL, "MICROSTRUCTURAL INVESTIGATIONS IN THE SEMI-SOLID STATE OF THE STEEL X210CRW12 UNTERSUCHUNGEN ZUR GEFUEGEENTWICKLUNG DES STAHLES X210CRW12 IM TELLFLUESSIGEN BEREICH", STEEL RESEARCH, DUESSELDORF, DE, (200107), vol. 72, no. 7, ISSN 0177-4832, pages 271 - 276, XP008015461 [A] 1-5 * page 271 - page 276 *
 [A]  - KAPRANOS P ET AL, "SEMI-SOLID PROCESSING OF TOOL STEEL", BULLETIN DE L'ACADEMIE NATIONALE DE MEDECINE, XX, XX, (199311), vol. 3, no. 7, PART 2, pages 835 - 840, XP008015460 [A] 1-5 * page 835 - page 840 *
 [A]  - KAPRANOS P ET AL, "SEMI-SOLID PROCESSING OF ALUMINIUM AND HIGH MELTING POINT ALLOYS", INSTITUTION OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS. PROCEEDINGS. JOURNAL OF ENGINEERING MANUFACTURE, MECHANICAL ENGINEERING PUBLICATIONS LTD. LONDON, GB, (1993), vol. 207, no. B01, ISSN 0954-4054, pages 1 - 8, XP008015462 [A] 1-5 * page 1 - page 8 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1243/PIME_PROC_1993_207_055_02
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.