blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Mon-Sat 05.00 - 05.15 hrs CET; Sun: 05.00 - 06.00 hrs CET.
SIPO Global Dossier service temporarily unavailable on 17 March 2017 from 19:00 until approximately 23:00 CST

17.03.2017

More...
blank News flashes

Turkey joins the Federated European Patent Register

Click here for more information on the Federated European Patent Register.

10.03.2017

More...
blank Related links

All documents: EP1426676  


Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 270
24.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.03.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 18
13.03.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
06.02.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.02.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
02.02.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.01.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.01.2015 F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name Appeal 1
13.01.2015 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
21.07.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
02.07.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
16.06.2014 Claims Appeal 1
16.06.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
10.06.2014 Claims Appeal 1
10.06.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
11.04.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
11.04.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
07.04.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
07.04.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
07.04.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
03.02.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
28.01.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
28.01.2014 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
28.01.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
28.01.2014 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
28.01.2014 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
28.01.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 8
28.01.2014 Means of redress Search / examination 2
28.01.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
28.01.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
28.01.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
28.01.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
04.12.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
04.12.2013 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
04.12.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
03.12.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
03.12.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
03.12.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
03.12.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
29.11.2013 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
28.11.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
28.11.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
27.11.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
22.11.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.11.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
30.10.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
30.10.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
30.10.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
30.10.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
05.10.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
04.10.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
23.09.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
23.09.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
23.09.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
16.09.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
13.02.2013 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
06.02.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
06.02.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
06.02.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
06.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
06.02.2013 Request for further processing Search / examination 3
31.01.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
31.01.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
31.01.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
31.01.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
31.01.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
31.01.2013 Request for further processing Search / examination 3
23.11.2012 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
09.08.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
04.08.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.08.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.04.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
11.04.2012 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
11.04.2012 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
14.12.2011 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
15.11.2011 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
07.11.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
07.11.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
07.11.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
07.11.2011 Request for further processing Search / examination 4
28.10.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
28.10.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
28.10.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
28.10.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
28.10.2011 Request for further processing Search / examination 4
26.10.2011 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 2
10.05.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
10.05.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.11.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
12.11.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.10.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.09.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.09.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.09.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.06.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
05.06.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.09.2008 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
18.09.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
18.09.2008 Request for further processing Search / examination 4
12.09.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
12.09.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
12.09.2008 Request for further processing Search / examination 4
14.07.2008 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
10.12.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
08.12.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.12.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.11.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
23.11.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.10.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
10.10.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.10.2007 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
04.05.2007 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
30.03.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.03.2007 European search report Search / examination 2
28.04.2004 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
18.03.2004 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
28.11.2003 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.11.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
28.11.2003 Description Search / examination 10
28.11.2003 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.11.2003 Drawings Search / examination 6
28.11.2003 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
28.11.2003 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.11.2003 Priority document Search / examination 24
28.11.2003 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6