Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1431861

EP1431861 - Security token sharable data and synchronization cache [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.04.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 31.05.2017  [2017/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Assa Abloy AB
Klarabergviadukten 90
111 64 Stockholm / SE
[2014/32]
Former [2013/09]For all designated states
ActivIdentity, Inc.
6623 Dumbarton Circle
Fremont, CA 94555 / US
Former [2004/26]For all designated states
ACTIVCARD IRELAND LIMITED
30 Herbert Street
Dublin 2 / IE
Inventor(s)01 / Massard, Yves Michel Pascal
34680 Teal Common
Fremont, CA 94555 / US
 [2004/26]
Representative(s)Freischem & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Salierring 47-53
50677 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/07]Patentanwälte Freischem
An Groß St. Martin 2
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2010/52]Patentanwälte Freischem
An Groß St. Martin 2
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2004/26]Colas, Jean-Pierre
Cabinet JP Colas 37, avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date03293181.816.12.2003
[2004/26]
Priority number, dateUS2002032067817.12.2002         Original published format: US 320678
[2004/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1431861
Date:23.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1431861
Date:19.07.2006
[2006/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP19.06.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/00
[2004/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/26]
TitleGerman:Gemeinsam benutzbare Daten eines Sicherheits-Tokens und Synchronisationscache[2004/26]
English:Security token sharable data and synchronization cache[2004/26]
French:Données de jeton de sécurité utilisables en commun et un cache de synchronisation[2004/26]
Examination procedure04.01.2007Examination requested  [2007/08]
13.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.11.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2010Date of oral proceedings
24.01.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/22]
24.01.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
14.03.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/22]
Appeal following examination31.03.2011Appeal received No.  T1307/11
31.05.2011Statement of grounds filed
14.03.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
14.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
17.03.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP17160696.5
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.03.2007
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
24.01.2008Request for further processing filed
24.01.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.02.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
17.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
15.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
12.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0248889  (MAXXAN SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-21 * page 1, line 9 - line 11 * * page 4, line 9 - page 5, line 2 * * page 6, line 19 - line 20 * * page 12, column 19 - page 13, column 1 * * page 21, line 12 - line 21 *;
 [X]US5854891  (POSTLEWAITE WILLIAM M [US], et al) [X] 1,18 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 23 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US2001002480  (DEKONING RODNEY A [US], et al) [X] 1,18 * page 2, paragraph 14 - paragraph 18 *;
 [X]US5941947  (BROWN ROSS M [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 14 * * column 24, line 1 - column 28, line 2 *
 [X]  COLIN GOULD MORRIS BAHRAMI, "Caching and Replaying of Responses to Speed up Smart card Communication", IP.COM JOURNAL, IP.COM INC., WEST HENRIETTA, NY, US, (20010801), ISSN 1533-0001, XP013000520 [X] 1-21 * the whole document *