Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1413362 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1236
19.05.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
17.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.05.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 20
12.05.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.05.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.05.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
05.05.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
05.05.2017 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
10.04.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.04.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
05.04.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
31.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.03.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
27.03.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
13.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
13.03.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
27.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.02.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.02.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
06.02.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
06.02.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
06.02.2017 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 10
01.02.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.12.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
22.12.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.12.2016 Request concerning the applicant/representative Appeal 1
16.12.2016 Request for a change of address - opponent Appeal 1
30.11.2016 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
09.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.07.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
27.06.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
08.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.06.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.04.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.04.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.04.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
01.04.2016 F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name Appeal 1
01.04.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
01.04.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
01.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.03.2016 Claims Appeal 5
21.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
21.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.03.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 7
21.03.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
23.02.2016 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
23.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 1
23.02.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
05.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.02.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
01.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
01.02.2016 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
28.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.01.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
22.01.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
22.01.2016 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
22.01.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 8
22.01.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
22.01.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
22.01.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
22.01.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
22.01.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
22.01.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.01.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 13
04.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.12.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
18.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
18.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 14
18.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 19
17.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.12.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
16.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 20
15.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
15.12.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
14.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
14.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
14.12.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
14.12.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
14.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
14.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
14.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
31.10.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
28.10.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.07.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
28.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 6
23.07.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
14.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
06.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.07.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
06.07.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
06.07.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.07.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.07.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
02.07.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.07.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
02.07.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
01.07.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
01.07.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
16.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
16.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
16.04.2015 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Opposition 1
14.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
13.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
13.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
09.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
13.02.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
09.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
09.02.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.10.2014 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
30.10.2014 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
30.10.2014 Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 18
29.07.2014 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 3
23.07.2014 Fax relating to review procedure Appeal 3
15.07.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Opposition 1
10.07.2014 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
10.07.2014 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
17.06.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.06.2014 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
02.06.2014 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
17.05.2014 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 8
09.05.2014 Fax relating to review procedure Appeal 8
11.04.2014 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal during review procedure Appeal 7
17.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
11.03.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
05.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
05.03.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
19.02.2014 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
12.02.2014 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
07.02.2014 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 5
07.02.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
05.02.2014 Fax relating to review procedure Appeal 1
05.02.2014 Fax relating to review procedure Appeal 5
05.02.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
05.02.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
28.01.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
22.01.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
17.01.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
13.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
09.01.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
24.12.2013 Request for acceleration of the opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.12.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
17.12.2013 Request for acceleration of the opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.12.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.12.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.12.2013 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 12
06.12.2013 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 12
06.12.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
06.12.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
06.12.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
08.10.2013 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
08.10.2013 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
07.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
04.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
04.10.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
30.09.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
30.09.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.09.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.09.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.09.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
03.09.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.08.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
29.07.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.07.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.07.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.07.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.07.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 10
09.07.2013 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.03.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.03.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.03.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
06.03.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.02.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.02.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 4
17.01.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
05.12.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
08.11.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.10.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.10.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 26
25.10.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 27
06.09.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
06.09.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
28.08.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
27.08.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
24.08.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
24.08.2012 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
06.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.06.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.06.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.06.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.06.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
25.06.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
25.06.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
25.06.2012 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
25.06.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 6
25.06.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.06.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.06.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
25.06.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.03.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
26.03.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
20.03.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
07.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.03.2012 Claims Opposition 5
03.03.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
03.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
03.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
03.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.03.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.03.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
29.02.2012 Claims Opposition 5
29.02.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
29.02.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
29.02.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 20
10.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
10.10.2011 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
28.09.2011 Authorisation of representative Opposition 2
28.09.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
13.08.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.07.2011 General enquiry Opposition 1
08.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.07.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
08.07.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
08.07.2011 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
08.07.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.07.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.07.2011 General enquiry Opposition 1
30.10.2010 Request for acceleration of the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
25.10.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
25.10.2010 Request for acceleration of the opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.10.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
30.09.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
30.09.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
28.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
28.07.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
28.07.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.07.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
26.03.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
26.03.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.03.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.03.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
11.03.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
11.03.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
11.03.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.03.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 6
05.03.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
09.02.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
09.02.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
09.02.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
09.02.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
09.02.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
09.02.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
09.02.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
09.02.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
09.02.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.02.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.02.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
06.02.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
06.02.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
06.02.2009 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
17.04.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
31.03.2008 English translation of the claims Search / examination 5
31.03.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
31.03.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
26.03.2008 English translation of the claims Search / examination 5
26.03.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
26.03.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
26.03.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.03.2008 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
29.11.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
29.11.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
29.11.2007 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
29.11.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
15.10.2007 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.10.2004 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
20.10.2004 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
04.05.2004 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
31.03.2004 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
17.03.2004 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
09.02.2004 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
09.02.2004 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.02.2004 European search report Search / examination 1
07.10.2003 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.10.2003 Claims Search / examination 4
07.10.2003 Description Search / examination 12
07.10.2003 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.2003 Drawings Search / examination 7
07.10.2003 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
07.10.2003 Priority document Search / examination 18
07.10.2003 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7