Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1582665 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1582665



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 192
14.05.2007 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
22.01.2007 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
29.11.2006 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 12
04.09.2006 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
23.08.2006 Invitation to pay examination fee/designation fees with additional fee Search / examination 1
29.06.2006 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 6
25.04.2006 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
21.12.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
21.10.2005 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 2
21.10.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
10.10.2005 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
05.09.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
30.08.2005 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
24.08.2005 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
22.08.2005 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 6
20.10.2004 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 2
20.10.2004 Priority document Search / examination 12
20.10.2004 Translation of priority document Search / examination 22
25.08.2004 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
04.08.2004 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2004 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2004 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
23.07.2004 Annex Search / examination 1
23.07.2004 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.07.2004 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
08.07.2004 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
08.07.2004 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.03.2004 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.03.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
12.03.2004 Description Search / examination 5
12.03.2004 Drawings Search / examination 1
12.03.2004 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
12.03.2004 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
12.03.2004 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 1
12.03.2004 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 8
12.03.2004 Translation of priority document Search / examination 10
11.03.2004 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 1
18.02.2004 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
13.02.2004 Annex Search / examination 10
13.02.2004 Annex Search / examination 12
13.02.2004 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 2
11.02.2004 Annex Search / examination 1
11.02.2004 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
11.02.2004 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.10.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
20.10.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.10.2003 European search report Search / examination 1
09.10.2003 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
04.10.2003 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
04.10.2003 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
26.09.2003 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
17.09.2003 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
09.09.2003 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
09.09.2003 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.07.2003 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.07.2003 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
22.07.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
22.07.2003 Description Search / examination 5
22.07.2003 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.07.2003 Drawings Search / examination 4
22.07.2003 Drawings Search / examination 4
22.07.2003 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
22.07.2003 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 7