Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1488738

EP1488738 - Patient cable for medical measurements [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  25.05.2007
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INSTRUMENTARIUM CORPORATION
Kuortaneenkatu 2
00510 Helsinki / FI
[2004/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Uutela, Kimmo Henrik
Eteläinen Hesperiankatu 32 B 22
00200 Helsinki / FI
02 / Miettinen, Sami Petri Ilmari
Hietalahdenkatu 12 D 58
00180 Helsinki / FI
03 / Niklander, Tapani Wilhelm
Maamolahdentie 1 G 30
00200 Helsinki / FI
04 / Virtanen, Juha Petri
Suovatie 14 A
00660 Helsinki / FI
 [2004/52]
Representative(s)Valkeiskangas, Tapio Lassi Paavali
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Valkeiskangas, Tapio Lassi Paavali
Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Former [2004/52]Valkeiskangas, Tapio
Kolster Oy AB, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date03396061.819.06.2003
[2004/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1488738
Date:22.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/0428
[2004/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/52]
TitleGerman:Patientenkabel für medizinische Messungen[2004/52]
English:Patient cable for medical measurements[2004/52]
French:Cable pour mesurages médicaux sur un patient[2004/52]
Examination procedure02.07.2003Examination requested  [2004/52]
06.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2007Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/26]
13.02.2007Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DXY]US4951672  (BUCHWALD RANDALL H [US], et al) [DX] 8 * column 1, line 10 - line 16 * * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 17; figure 1 * [Y] 1-7,9,10;
 [Y]US4301428  (MAYER FERDY) [Y] 1-7,9,10 * column 1, line 6 - line 11 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 30 * * column 7, line 24 - line 32; figures 1,4 *;
 [A]JPH0471536  ;
 [A]WO0213689  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * page 31, line 20 - line 25; figure 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920622), vol. 016, no. 277, Database accession no. (C - 0954), & JP04071536 A 19920306 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,8 * abstract *
by applicantUS4951672
 US6032063
 US5523534
 DE19922999