blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1330961 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1330961



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 938
19.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.09.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
06.09.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
05.09.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
31.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.08.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 24
30.08.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.08.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.08.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
17.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.07.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.07.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.07.2016 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 4
07.06.2016 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 11
07.06.2016 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 11
23.05.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
23.05.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
20.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.05.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
20.05.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
18.05.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
18.05.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
16.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
16.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.05.2016 Amended description with annotations Appeal 1
16.05.2016 Claims Appeal 3
16.05.2016 Claims Appeal 2
16.05.2016 Claims Appeal 3
16.05.2016 Description Appeal 1
16.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.05.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
22.03.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 7
22.03.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 7
18.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.03.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
07.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.01.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
04.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.12.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
09.12.2015 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
07.12.2015 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
02.12.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.12.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
01.12.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
11.11.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.11.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
23.10.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
02.07.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.06.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 22
20.06.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Appeal 6
22.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
22.11.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
06.11.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.11.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.10.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 15
24.10.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
21.09.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
18.06.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.05.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.05.2012 Non-scannable object Appeal 7
26.05.2012 Non-scannable object Appeal 10
26.05.2012 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
26.05.2012 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
26.05.2012 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
26.05.2012 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.05.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 25
25.05.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 76
29.02.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
21.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.02.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 1
14.02.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
14.02.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
09.02.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
06.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
25.01.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.01.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.01.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.01.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.01.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 12
19.01.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
19.01.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
19.01.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
19.01.2012 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 7
19.01.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 8
19.01.2012 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
19.01.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.01.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.01.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
19.01.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
19.01.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.12.2011 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
09.11.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
09.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
09.11.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.11.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.11.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.11.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.11.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 4
09.11.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
28.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
21.10.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
21.10.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
21.10.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
21.10.2011 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.10.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 17
15.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
15.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.10.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 17
13.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.10.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
26.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.09.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
22.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.02.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.01.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.01.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.01.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
18.01.2011 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
18.01.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.10.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Opposition 1
21.09.2010 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
12.02.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.04.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
22.05.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
11.05.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
25.04.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2007 Claims Opposition 2
24.04.2007 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
20.04.2007 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 13
13.02.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.02.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
12.02.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.02.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.10.2006 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
20.10.2006 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
08.09.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.09.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.2006 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.08.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.08.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.08.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
02.08.2006 Notice of opposition Opposition 20
02.08.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
02.08.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
02.08.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
02.08.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
02.08.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.07.2006 Notice of opposition Opposition 21
04.11.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.10.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
13.10.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
13.10.2005 Request for accelerated grant Search / examination 1
27.06.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
27.06.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.06.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
21.06.2005 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.09.2004 Claims Search / examination 3
09.09.2004 Description Search / examination 2
09.09.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.05.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
18.05.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.10.2003 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
03.09.2003 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
22.08.2003 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
06.08.2003 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
04.08.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
18.06.2003 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
21.05.2003 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
06.05.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
06.05.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.05.2003 European search report Search / examination 1
22.01.2003 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.01.2003 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
22.01.2003 Claims Search / examination 3
22.01.2003 Description Search / examination 10
22.01.2003 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.01.2003 Drawings Search / examination 2
22.01.2003 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
22.01.2003 Priority document Search / examination 15
22.01.2003 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
22.01.2003 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 11
22.01.2003 Translation of priority document Search / examination 15