Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1378406

EP1378406 - Apparatus for restricting activation of engine starting system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.2007
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.08.2007  [2007/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO
260, Toyota 3-chome
Ohguchi-cho
Niwa-gun
Aichi 480-0195 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/36]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO
260, Toyota 3-chome, Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun
Aichi 480-0195 / JP
Former [2004/02]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Tokai Rika Denki Seisakusho
260, Toyota 3-chome, Ohguchi-cho
Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0195 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ohtaki, Kiyokazu, K.K. Tokai Rika Denki Seisakusho
260, Toyota 3-chome, Ohguchi-cho, Niwa-gun
Aichi 480-0195 / JP
02 / Harada, Shoichi, K.K. Tokai Rika Denki Seisakusho
260, Toyota 3-chome, Ohguchi-cho, Niwa-gun
Aichi 480-0195 / JP
03 / Okuno, Masanari, K.K. Tokai Rika Denki Seisakusho
260, Toyota 3-chome, Ohguchi-cho, Niwa-gun
Aichi 480-0195 / JP
04 / Shoji, Osamu, K.K. Tokai Rika Denki Seisakusho
260, Toyota 3-chome, Ohguchi-cho, Niwa-gun
Aichi 480-0195 / JP
 [2004/02]
Representative(s)Axelsson, Rolf
Kransell & Wennborg KB Box 27834
115 93 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/02]Axelsson, Rolf
Kransell & Wennborg AB Box 27834
115 93 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date03445064.328.05.2003
[2004/02]
Priority number, dateJP2002015619329.05.2002         Original published format: JP 2002156193
JP2002015619429.05.2002         Original published format: JP 2002156194
[2004/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1378406
Date:07.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1378406
Date:20.10.2004
[2004/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1378406
Date:06.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.2004
ClassificationInternational:B60R25/04, B60R25/02
[2004/43]
Former International [2004/02]B60R25/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2005/28]
Former [2004/02]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Verhinderung der Aktivierung eines Motoranlassersystems[2004/02]
English:Apparatus for restricting activation of engine starting system[2004/02]
French:Dispositif permettant de limiter l'activation du système de démarrage d'un moteur[2004/02]
Examination procedure26.11.2004Examination requested  [2005/04]
18.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.2006Fee for grant paid
20.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.06.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE19821899  (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,9,11-14 * column 1, line 3 - column 5, line 22; figures 1-4 * [A] 2-8,15-17;
 [A]DE19951986  (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH) [A] 2-8,15-17 * column 4, line 5 - column 8, line 63; figures 1-10 *;
 [A]GB1497294  (NEIMAN SA) [A] 2-8,15-17 * column 2, line 83; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE4037918  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG, 8000 MÜNCHEN, DE) [A] 2-8,15-17 * column 3, line 2 - column 6, line 25; figures 1-7 *