Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1470646

EP1470646 - ADAPTIVE VARIABLE LENGTH CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.03.2011
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change - applicantpublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[2019/36]
Former [2015/32]For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2014/24]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2004/44]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / KARCZEWICZ, Marta
1224 Hidden Ridge, 3097
Irving, TX 75038 / US
 [2004/44]
Representative(s)Berggren Oy, Tampere
Visiokatu 1
33720 Tampere / FI
[N/P]
Former [2004/44]Pursiainen, Timo Pekka
Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy, Hermiankatu 12B
33720 Tampere / FI
Application number, filing date03700323.322.01.2003
[2004/44]
WO2003FI00055
Priority number, dateUS2002005461022.01.2002         Original published format: US 54610
[2004/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03063360
Date:31.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1470646
Date:27.10.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2003
[2004/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE31.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:H03M7/42
[2004/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/44]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
TitleGerman:ADAPTIVE VARIABLE-LÄNGE-CODIERUNG[2004/44]
English:ADAPTIVE VARIABLE LENGTH CODING[2004/44]
French:CODAGE A LONGUEUR VARIABLE ADAPTATIF[2004/44]
Entry into regional phase27.07.2004National basic fee paid 
27.07.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
27.07.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
27.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/44]
15.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
16.02.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
20.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination27.04.2017Appeal received No.  T1619/17
30.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.11.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
12.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
13.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
14.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
11.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
10.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
21.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
10.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 16
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 17
Cited inInternational search[X]US5400075  (SAVATIER TRISTAN [US]);
 [X]US2001033697  (SHIMADA TOSHIAKI [JP]);
 [X]US5835145  (OUYANG CHI [US], et al);
 [A]US5793314  (AUYEUNG CHEUNG [US])
 [Y]  - WEN J. ET AL., "Utilizing soft information in decoding of variable length codes", PROCEEDINGS DCC'99 DATA COMPRESSION CONFERENCE, SNOWBIRD, UT, USA, (19990329), pages 131 - 139, XP002143233