Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1468397

EP1468397 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTOURING REDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.08.2018
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
InterDigital Madison Patent Holdings
3 rue du Colonel Moll
75017 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Willis, Donald Henry
5175 East 74th Place
Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US
For all designated states
Hague, John Alan
5770 Broadway
Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US
[2018/40]
Former [2017/21]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing DTV
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
For all designated states
Willis, Donald Henry
5175 East 74th Place
Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US
For all designated states
Hague, John Alan
5770 Broadway
Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US
Former [2010/07]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
For all designated states
Willis, Donald Henry
5175 East 74th Place
Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US
For all designated states
Hague, John Alan
5770 Broadway
Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US
Former [2005/40]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
For all designated states
Willis, Donald Henry
5175 East 74th Place
Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US
For all designated states
Hague, John Alan
5770 Broadway
Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US
Former [2004/43]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing S.A.
46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR
For all designated states
Willis, Donald Henry
5175 East 74th Place
Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US
For all designated states
Hague, John Alan
5770 Broadway
Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WILLIS, Donald, Henry
5175 East 74th Place
Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US
02 / HAGUE, John, Alan
5770 Broadway
Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US
 [2004/43]
Representative(s)Vidon Brevets & Stratégie
16B, rue de Jouanet
BP 90333
35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2004/48]Rossmanith, Manfred, Dr.
Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Former [2004/43]Hartnack, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date03703878.317.01.2003
[2004/43]
WO2003US01525
Priority number, dateUS2002005659525.01.2002         Original published format: US 56595
[2004/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03065293
Date:07.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1468397
Date:20.10.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003
[2004/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.08.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06T5/00
[2017/19]
Former International [2004/43]G06K9/40
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/43]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR KONTURIERUNGS REDUKTION[2004/43]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTOURING REDUCTION[2004/43]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE REDUCTION DES EFFETS DE BORD[2004/43]
Entry into regional phase24.07.2004National basic fee paid 
24.07.2004Search fee paid 
24.07.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.08.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/43]
29.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
24.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
25.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
26.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
26.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
25.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
27.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
19.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
24.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
22.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
24.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 16
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201917   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5218649  (KUNDU AMLAN [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 6, line 23 - line l * * column 8, line 6 - line 9 * * column 9, line 5 - line 46 *;
 [A]EP0693857  (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0555674  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-18 * page 3 - page 6 *
 [A]  - ANDREWS H C, "Monochrome digital image enhancement", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (19760201), vol. 15, no. 2, doi:10.1364/AO.15.000495, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 495 - 503, XP002387861 [A] 1-18 * page 502, column l, line 21 - column 5, line 8 * * page 503, column r, line 6 - line 11 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.15.000495
International search[X]US5579054  (SEZAN M IBRAHIM [US], et al);
 [A]US5835117  (SMALL JEFFREY A [US])
by applicantUS5218649