Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1475678

EP1475678 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HOLOGRAM BY PICOSECOND LASER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/46]METHOD FOR PRODUCING HOLOGRAM BY PICO-SECOND LASER
[2011/26]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.12.2011
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Japan Science and Technology Agency
1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi
Saitama 332-0012 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/46]For all designated states
Japan Science and Technology Agency
1-8, Honcho 4-chome
Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332-0012 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HOSONO, Hideo
4-212, 2786-4-21 Shimotsuruma
Yamato-shi, Kanagawa 242-0001 / JP
02 / HIRANO, Masahiro
5-6, Matsubara 5-chome
Setagaya-ku, Tokyo 156-0043 / JP
03 / KAWAMURA, Kenichi
Room 203, Maison East
8-2, Higashirinkan 3-chome
Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 228-0811 / JP
04 / MIURA, Taisuke
R. 306 New G. C.I
6-9-3 Kamikodanaka
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 221-0053 / JP
05 / KAMIOKA, Hayato
R.205, Sunny Flat
1-21-20, Kitamigata
Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0005 / JP
 [2012/02]
Former [2004/46]01 / HOSONO, Hideo
4-212, 2786-4-21 Shimotsuruma
Yamato-shi, Kanagawa 242-0001 / JP
02 / HIRANO, Masahiro
5-6, Matsubara 5-chome
Setagaya-ku, Tokyo 156-0043 / JP
03 / KAWAMURA, Kenichi
Room 203, Maison East, 8-2, Higashirinkan 3-chome
Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 228-0811 / JP
04 / MIURA, Taisuke
R. 306 New G. C.I, 6-9-3 Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 221-0053 / JP
05 / KAMIOKA, Hayato
R.205, Sunny Flat, 1-21-20, Kitamigata, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0005 / JP
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/02]Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2004/46]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing.
Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date03705133.113.02.2003
[2004/46]
WO2003JP01514
Priority number, dateJP2002003601013.02.2002         Original published format: JP 2002036010
[2004/46]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03069416
Date:21.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1475678
Date:10.11.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2003
[2004/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1475678
Date:11.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.08.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:G03H1/04
[2004/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2012/02]
Former [2004/46]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HOLOGRAMMS DURCH EINEN PICOSEKUNDENLASER[2011/26]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HOLOGRAM BY PICOSECOND LASER[2011/26]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN HOLOGRAMME A L'AIDE D'UN LASER PICOSECONDE[2011/26]
Former [2004/46]VERFAHREN ZUR ERSTELLUNG EINES HOLOGRAMMS DURCH EINEN PICO-SEKUNDENLASER
Former [2004/46]METHOD FOR PRODUCING HOLOGRAM BY PICO-SECOND LASER
Former [2004/46]PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'HOLOGRAMMES A L'AIDE D'UN LASER PICOSECONDE
Entry into regional phase13.08.2004Translation filed 
13.08.2004National basic fee paid 
13.08.2004Search fee paid 
13.08.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.05.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
13.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/46]
07.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.07.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.11.2011Fee for grant paid
24.11.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.05.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.10.2012   
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Obst, Bernhard
Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB
Postdamer Platz 10
10785 Berlin / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/45]
Opponent(s)01  02.10.2012   
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Obst, Bernhard
Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner
Postdamer Platz 10
10785 Berlin / DE
15.11.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.02.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.01.2016Date of oral proceedings
10.02.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.02.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition12.04.2016Appeal received No.  T0914/16
17.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
05.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
25.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
28.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XD]EP1162519  (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP [JP] JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP]) [XD] 1,3-10 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0052] * * claims 1,2,7,8,10,11,17 *;
 [A]US4118685  (SIMPSON HOMER L) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 26 - line 47 * * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 27 *;
 [A]US3669541  (DUGUAY MICHEL ALBERT) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 49 - line 75 *
International search[Y]JP2001236002  ;
 [Y]JPH10105029
Examination   - KAWAMURA AND HIRANO, "Holographic writing of volume-type microgratings in silica glass by a single chirped laser pulse", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (20020805), vol. 81, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1063/1.1497997, pages 1137 - 1139, XP012033189

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1497997