Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1483817

EP1483817 - DEVICE FOR A BATTERY CHARGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.11.2012
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.2016Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 28.12.2016  [2016/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CTEK Sweden AB
Rostugnsvägen 3
776 70 Vikmanshyttan / SE
[2011/29]
Former [2004/50]For all designated states
Creator Teknisk Utveckling AB
Rostugnsvägen 3
77670 Vikmanshyttan / SE
Inventor(s)01 / NORDLÖF, Peter
Gimlestigen 25
S-77460 AVESTA / SE
 [2004/50]
Representative(s)Brann AB
P.O. Box 3690
Drottninggatan 27
103 59 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2013/46]Brann AB
P.O. Box 12246
102 26 Stockholm / SE
Former [2012/49]Holmberg, Nils Anders Patrik , et al
BRANN AB
P.O. Box 12246
102 26 Stockholm / SE
Former [2004/50]Holmberg, Nils Anders Patrik , et al
Dr Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 17192
104 62 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date03705602.518.02.2003
[2004/50]
WO2003SE00263
Priority number, dateSE2002000046118.02.2002         Original published format: SE 0200461
[2004/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03069760
Date:21.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1483817
Date:08.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2003
[2004/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1483817
Date:05.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE21.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:H02J7/02
[2012/14]
Former International [2004/50]H02J7/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/50]
TitleGerman:EINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN BATTERIELADEGERÄT[2004/50]
English:DEVICE FOR A BATTERY CHARGER[2004/50]
French:DISPOSITIF DESTINE A UN CHARGEUR DE BATTERIE[2004/50]
Entry into regional phase01.09.2004National basic fee paid 
01.09.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
01.09.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
03.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/50]
03.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.2012Fee for grant paid
14.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.07.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.09.2013  09.09.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Fronius International GmbH
Froniusstrasse 1
4643 Pettenbach / AT
Opponent's representative
Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
 [N/P]
Former [2016/52]
Opponent(s)01  04.09.2013  09.09.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Fronius International GmbH
Froniusstrasse 1
4643 Pettenbach / AT
Opponent's representative
Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
Former [2013/41]
Opponent(s)01  04.09.2013   
Fronius International GmbH
Vorchdorfer Strasse 40
4643 Pettenbach / AT
Opponent's representative
Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
A-1010 Wien / AT
11.10.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.02.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
22.07.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.08.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition16.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2154/16
21.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
20.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
20.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
23.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
24.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
23.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200503   M06   Fee paid on   23.04.2005
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.02.2003
AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
DK05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
TR05.12.2012
IE18.02.2013
LU18.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG05.03.2013
GR06.03.2013
PT05.04.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
DK05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
TR05.12.2012
IE18.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG05.03.2013
GR06.03.2013
PT05.04.2013
Former [2014/07]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
DK05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
IE18.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG05.03.2013
GR06.03.2013
PT05.04.2013
Former [2013/48]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
DK05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG05.03.2013
GR06.03.2013
PT05.04.2013
Former [2013/42]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
MC28.02.2013
BG05.03.2013
GR06.03.2013
PT05.04.2013
Former [2013/40]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
BG05.03.2013
GR06.03.2013
PT05.04.2013
Former [2013/35]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
CZ05.12.2012
EE05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
SK05.12.2012
BG05.03.2013
GR06.03.2013
Former [2013/34]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
BG05.03.2013
GR06.03.2013
Former [2013/33]AT05.12.2012
BE05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
GR06.03.2013
Former [2013/31]AT05.12.2012
CY05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
GR06.03.2013
Former [2013/26]CY05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
SI05.12.2012
GR06.03.2013
Former [2013/24]CY05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
GR06.03.2013
Former [2013/23]CY05.12.2012
FI05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
Former [2013/22]FI05.12.2012
SE05.12.2012
Former [2013/21]SE05.12.2012
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5644211  ;
 [Y]EP0637119  ;
 [A]US5319298  ;
 [A]US4876496