Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1483404

EP1483404 - METHODS FOR DETECTING GENOME-WIDE SEQUENCE VARIATIONS ASSOCIATED WITH A PHENOTYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.03.2007
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.04.2007  [2007/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solexa Ltd.
Little Chesterford
Saffron Walden, Essex CB10 1XL / GB
For all designated states
Solexa, Inc.
25861 Industrial Blvd.
Hayward, CA 94545 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/52]For all designated states
Solexa Ltd.
Little Chesterford
Saffron Walden, Essex CB10 1XL / GB
For all designated states
Solexa, Inc
25861 Industrial Blvd
Hayward CA 94545 / US
Former [2004/50]For all designated states
Solexa Ltd.
Little Chesterford
Saffron Walden, Essex CB10 1XL / GB
For all designated states
Lynx Therapeutics Inc.
25861 Industrial Boulevard
Hayward, CA 94545 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MAYER, Pascal
Residence les Closets, Chemin de Ney
F-01200 Eloise / FR
02 / LEVIEV, Ilia
33 route de Yens
CH-1143 Apples / CH
03 / OSTERAS, Magne
32, route de Cite-Ouest
CH-1196 Gland / CH
04 / FARINELLI, Laurent
55 Chemin du Grand-Puits
CH-1217 Meyrin / CH
 [2004/50]
Representative(s)White, Nina Louise , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/50]White, Nina Louise , et al
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date03706768.305.03.2003
[2004/50]
WO2003GB00941
Priority number, dateGB2002000515305.03.2002         Original published format: GB 0205153
US20020362023P05.03.2002         Original published format: US 362023 P
[2004/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03074734
Date:12.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/37]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1483404
Date:08.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003
[2004/50]
Search report(s)International search reportEP19.02.2004
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2004/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/50]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:METHODEN ZUR DETEKTION GENOM-ÜBERSPANNENDER SEQUENZVARIATIONEN, WELCHE MIT EINEM PHENOTYP ASSOZIIERT SIND[2004/50]
English:METHODS FOR DETECTING GENOME-WIDE SEQUENCE VARIATIONS ASSOCIATED WITH A PHENOTYPE[2004/50]
French:PROCEDES DE DETECTION DE VARIATIONS DE SEQUENCE A L'ECHELLE DU GENOME ASSOCIEES A UN PHENOTYPE[2004/50]
Entry into regional phase05.10.2004National basic fee paid 
05.10.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
05.10.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.10.2004Examination requested  [2004/50]
22.11.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.10.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/14]
08.11.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200604   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0534858  (KEYGENE NV [NL]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-102;
 [X]WO8907647  (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO0149882  (KEYGENE NV [NL], et al);
 [A]WO0177392  (ASHBY MATTHEW [US]) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0014282  (LYNX THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al);
 [A]US6291181  (SAPOLSKY RONALD J [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *
 [XA]  - SHI MICHAEL M, "Enabling large-scale pharmacogenetic studies by high-throughput mutation detection and genotyping technologies", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY. WINSTON, US, (200002), vol. 47, no. 2, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 164 - 172, XP002197957 [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-102
 [X]  - UNRAU P ET AL, "NON-CLONING AMPLIFICATION OF SPECIFIC DNA FRAGMENTS FROM WHOLE GENOMIC DNA DIGESTS USING DNA INDEXERS", GENE, ELSEVIER BIOMEDICAL PRESS. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19940805), vol. 145, no. 2, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 163 - 169, XP002008283 [X] 1 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(94)90001-9
 [A]  - SHAPERO M H ET AL, "SNP genotyping by multiplexed solid-phase amplification and fluorescent minisequencing", GENOME RESEARCH, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, US, (2001), vol. 11, no. 11, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 1926 - 1934, XP002252459 [A] * the whole document *