Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1488816

EP1488816 - CLOSED CELL CULTURE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, CH, LI
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Next 21 K.K.
38-1, Hongo 3-chome
Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2017/33]
Former [2004/52]For all designated states
New X-national Technology K.K.
18-4, Shibuya 3-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 150-0002 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SUZUKI, Shigeki
4-22-13, Ikejiri
Setagaya-ku, Tokyo 154-0001 / JP
 [2004/52]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2017/40]
Former [2004/52]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date03707196.604.03.2003
[2004/52]
WO2003JP02501
Priority number, dateJP2002005712904.03.2002         Original published format: JP 2002057129
[2004/52]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03074100
Date:12.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1488816
Date:22.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003
[2004/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1488816
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.09.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61L27/38, C12N5/00, A61L27/54, A61L27/58, A61L27/60, A61L31/14, A61F13/00, A61M25/10, A61M37/00
[2017/17]
Former International [2004/52]A61L27/38, C12N5/00, // C12M3:00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/40]
Former [2004/52]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:GESCHLOSSENES ZELLKULTURSYSTEM[2004/52]
English:CLOSED CELL CULTURE SYSTEM[2004/52]
French:SYSTÈME DE CULTURE CELLULAIRE FERMÉ[2017/21]
Former [2004/52]SYSTEME DE CULTURE CELLULAIRE FERME
Entry into regional phase04.10.2004Translation filed 
04.10.2004National basic fee paid 
04.10.2004Search fee paid 
04.10.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.10.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.10.2004Examination requested  [2004/52]
23.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.04.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2017Fee for grant paid
21.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.08.2011
Opposition(s)05.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
24.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
30.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
22.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
21.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201311   M06   Fee paid on   22.08.2013
31.03.201513   M06   Fee paid on   21.08.2015
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
IT04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IE04.03.2018
LU04.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
IT04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IE04.03.2018
LU04.03.2018
Former [2019/04]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
IT04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
LU04.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
IT04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
Former [2018/41]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
IT04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
Former [2018/35]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
DK04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
Former [2018/23]AT04.10.2017
ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
SE04.10.2017
GR05.01.2018
Former [2018/22]ES04.10.2017
FI04.10.2017
NL04.10.2017
Former [2018/17]NL04.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO9531157  (THM BIOMEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,13 * page 3, lines 5-11 * * page 7, lines 19-28 * * page 9, lines 2-4 * * page 12, lines 16-29 * * page 14, lines 16-18 * * page 15, lines 30-36 * * page 22, lines 16-18 * * page 28, lines 18-31 * * page 30, lines 4-19 * * page 45; claim 79 * [I] 2,6,9-12;
 [X]WO9907276  (THERAPEUTIC MICRODIALYSIS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,13,14 * page 25, lines 11-16 * * page 28, line 9 - page 29, line 5 * * figure 16 *;
 [X]WO9308850  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,8,14 * page 4, lines 21-25 * * page 5, lines 10-20 * * page 7, lines 7-15 * * page 8, lines 3-4, 27-29 * * page 9, lines 8-10 * * page 22, lines 27-30 *;
 [A]US6218182  (NAUGHTON BRIAN A [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 2, lines 19-31 * * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 9 *;
 [A]US2001021529  (TAKAGI TAKAO [JP]) [A] 1-14 * page 3, paragraph 0024 * * page 8, paragraph 0104 * * page 16, paragraph 0179 - paragraph 0180 *
International search[X]WO9531157  (THM BIOMEDICAL INC [US], et al);
 [X]WO9907276  (THERAPEUTIC MICRODIALYSIS CORP [US], et al);
 [Y]US2001021529  (TAKAGI TAKAO [JP]);
 [Y]JPH1146759  (TERUMO CORP);
 [A]WO0187271  (DAVID JAMES JOHNSON [US])
ExaminationWO0187271
 US2001021529