Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1485976

EP1485976 - ABSOLUTELY CALIBRATED PERIODIC FILTERS AND SOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.11.2005
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.12.2005  [2005/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dicos Technologies Inc.
1400, boul. du Parc technologique, Suite 200
Quebec G1P 4R7 / CA
[2004/51]
Inventor(s)01 / CLICHE, Jean-François
490, 70e rue Est
Charlesbourg, Québec G1H 1B5 / CA
02 / TETU, Michel
4669 Henri-Laliberté
Cap-Rouge, Québec G1Y 3N2 / CA
03 / LATRASSE, Christine
344 rue Dolbeau
Québec, Québec G1S 2R3 / CA
04 / ZARKA, Alain
902 Monseigneur Grandin, App.4
Ste-Foy, Québec G1V 3Y1 / CA
 [2004/51]
Representative(s)Santarelli
49, avenue des Champs-Elysées
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2004/51]Santarelli
14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237
75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date03707971.217.03.2003
[2004/51]
WO2003CA00378
Priority number, dateUS20020364742P18.03.2002         Original published format: US 364742 P
CA2002241179213.11.2002         Original published format: CA 2411792
US2002029300413.11.2002         Original published format: US 293004
[2004/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03079504
Date:25.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1485976
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003
[2004/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.02.2004
ClassificationInternational:H01S5/0687
[2004/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ABSOLUT KALIBRIERTE PERIODISCHE FILTER UND QUELLEN[2004/51]
English:ABSOLUTELY CALIBRATED PERIODIC FILTERS AND SOURCES[2004/51]
French:SOURCES ET FILTRES PERIODIQUES A ETALONNAGE ABSOLU[2004/51]
Entry into regional phase23.08.2004National basic fee paid 
23.08.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
23.08.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.10.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/51]
31.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/51]
19.07.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]WO0207359  (STANFORD RES INST INT [US]) [A] 1-45 * abstract * * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 24 * * page 9, line 30 - page 16, line 32 * * figures 1,5 *;
 [A]EP0773640  (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-45 * abstract * * column 1, line 12 - column 2, line 7 * * column 2, line 58 - column 5, line 22 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4241997  (CHRAPLYVY ANDREW R [US]) [A] 1-45 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 36 *;
 [A]WO0111738  (CORETEK INC [US]) [A] 1-45 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 1 - paragraph 4 * * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 3 * * figures 3,4 *;
 [A]  - CLICHE J-F ET AL, "AUTOMATIC ABSOLUTE FREQUENCY CALIBRATION OF TUNABLE OPTICAL SOURCES", OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE. (OFC). TECHNICAL DIGEST POSTCONFERENCE EDITION. BALTIMORE, MD, MARCH 7 - 10, 2000, NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (20000307), vol. 2 OF 4, ISBN 0-7803-5952-6, pages WM20 - 1-WM20-3, XP001035925 [A] 1-45 * the whole document *