Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1485959

EP1485959 - OPTICAL LIGHTING DEVICE AND METHOD TO PRODUCE LIGHTING DEVICES ADOPTING SAID OPTICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.10.2010
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Automotive Lighting Rear Lamps Italia S.p.A.
Via Cavallo, 18
10078 Venaria Reale (TO) / IT
[2009/44]
Former [2004/51]For all designated states
Automotive Lighting Rear Lamps Italia S.p.A.
Via dell'Industria, 17
33028 Tolmezzo / IT
Inventor(s)01 / MELPIGNANO, Patrizia
Via Feltre, 1
I-33010 TAVAGNACCO / IT
02 / ZAMBONI, Roberto
Via Mazzini, 105
I-40100 BOLOGNA / IT
 [2004/51]
Representative(s)Petraz, Gilberto Luigi , et al
GLP S.r.l.
Viale Europa Unita, 171
33100 Udine / IT
[N/P]
Former [2004/51]Petraz, Gilberto Luigi , et al
GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2
33100 Udine / IT
Application number, filing date03708374.812.03.2003
[2004/51]
WO2003IB00895
Priority number, dateIT2002UD00059U12.03.2002         Original published format: IT UD20020059 U
[2004/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03077325
Date:18.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1485959
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2003
[2004/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1485959
Date:02.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:H01L51/52
[2009/24]
Former International [2004/51]H01L51/20, B29C33/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:OPTISCHE LEUCHTANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG LEUCHTANORDNUNGEN MIT SOLCHEN OPTISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN[2004/51]
English:OPTICAL LIGHTING DEVICE AND METHOD TO PRODUCE LIGHTING DEVICES ADOPTING SAID OPTICAL DEVICE[2004/51]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ECLAIRAGE OPTIQUE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE DISPOSITIFS D'ECLAIRAGE UTILISANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF D'ECLAIRAGE OPTIQUE[2004/51]
Entry into regional phase07.10.2004National basic fee paid 
07.10.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.10.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.10.2004Examination requested  [2004/51]
18.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.08.2009Fee for grant paid
24.08.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.09.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.12.2009
BE02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
CZ02.12.2009
DK02.12.2009
EE02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
NL02.12.2009
RO02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
SK02.12.2009
TR02.12.2009
BG02.03.2010
GR03.03.2010
IE12.03.2010
LU12.03.2010
ES13.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
PT02.04.2010
HU03.06.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/43]AT02.12.2009
BE02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
CZ02.12.2009
DK02.12.2009
EE02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
NL02.12.2009
RO02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
SK02.12.2009
BG02.03.2010
GR03.03.2010
IE12.03.2010
LU12.03.2010
ES13.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
PT02.04.2010
HU03.06.2010
Former [2012/42]AT02.12.2009
BE02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
CZ02.12.2009
DK02.12.2009
EE02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
NL02.12.2009
RO02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
SK02.12.2009
BG02.03.2010
GR03.03.2010
IE12.03.2010
ES13.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
PT02.04.2010
HU03.06.2010
Former [2011/10]AT02.12.2009
BE02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
CZ02.12.2009
DK02.12.2009
EE02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
NL02.12.2009
RO02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
SK02.12.2009
BG02.03.2010
GR03.03.2010
IE12.03.2010
ES13.03.2010
CH31.03.2010
LI31.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
PT02.04.2010
Former [2011/07]AT02.12.2009
BE02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
CZ02.12.2009
DK02.12.2009
EE02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
NL02.12.2009
RO02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
SK02.12.2009
BG02.03.2010
GR03.03.2010
IE12.03.2010
ES13.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
PT02.04.2010
Former [2010/46]AT02.12.2009
BE02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
CZ02.12.2009
EE02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
NL02.12.2009
RO02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
SK02.12.2009
BG02.03.2010
GR03.03.2010
ES13.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
PT02.04.2010
Former [2010/39]AT02.12.2009
BE02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
CZ02.12.2009
EE02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
NL02.12.2009
RO02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
SK02.12.2009
BG02.03.2010
ES13.03.2010
PT02.04.2010
Former [2010/37]AT02.12.2009
BE02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
CZ02.12.2009
EE02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
NL02.12.2009
RO02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
BG02.03.2010
ES13.03.2010
PT02.04.2010
Former [2010/36]AT02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
CZ02.12.2009
EE02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
NL02.12.2009
RO02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
BG02.03.2010
ES13.03.2010
PT02.04.2010
Former [2010/35]AT02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
EE02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
NL02.12.2009
RO02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
BG02.03.2010
ES13.03.2010
PT02.04.2010
Former [2010/32]AT02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
ES13.03.2010
Former [2010/30]AT02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
Former [2010/25]CY02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
Former [2010/23]FI02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
Former [2010/22]FI02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH10223367  ;
 [XA]JPH0976245  ;
 [XA]EP0509630  (DOLGOFF EUGENE [US]) [X] 34,37,38 * column 32, lines 26-51 * [A] 22-25,27,35,36;
 [A]JP2000077188  ;
 []US2002135664  (MASHIMO SEIJI [JP], et al) [ ] * page 7, paragraph 52 - page 8, paragraph 61; figures 3,4,9,10 * * page 10, paragraph 115 - page 11, line 122 *;
 [A]US2001033135  (DUGGAL ANIL RAJ [US], et al) [A] 1-3,11,13,15-20,22,29-32 * page 2, paragraph 31 - page 4, paragraph 49 * * page 8, paragraph 88 *;
 [A]JP2000155201  ;
 [PX]US2002141006  (POCIUS DOUGLAS W [US], et al) [PX] 1,2,6,9,11,21,22,24 * page 6, column 1, lines 42-44 * * page 4, paragraph 51 - page 5, paragraph 55 * * page 4, paragraph 48 * * page 2, paragraphs 11-13 *
 [XA]  - MADIGAN C F ET AL, "IMPROVEMENT OF OUTPUT COUPLING EFFICIENCY OF ORGANIC LIGHT-EMITTINGBY BACKSIDE SUBSTRATE MODIFICATION", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (20000327), vol. 76, no. 13, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 1650 - 1652, XP000950541 [X] 1-3,9,11,13,16,18,20,22,27,29 * page 1651, column 1, paragraph L - page 1652, column 2, paragraph L * [A] 6-8,14,17,19,31

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.126124
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, [X] 1-3,8,9,11,13,16,20,22,27,31 * abstract *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, [X] 34,38 * abstract * [A] 35-37
 [XA]  - PAN L-W ET AL, "Cylindrical plastic lens array fabricated by a micro intrusion process", MICRO ELECTRO MECHANICAL SYSTEMS, 1999. MEMS '99. TWELFTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ORLANDO, FL, USA 17-21 JAN. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990117), ISBN 0-7803-5194-0, pages 217 - 221, XP010321678 [X] 34,36,38 * the whole document * [A] 22-25,27
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, [A] 1-3,8,9,11,12,16-22,30 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, [A] 10,28 * abstract *