Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1543036

EP1543036 - PROTEIN FOR DIAGNOSING DIABETIC RETINOPATHY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.04.2008
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eyegene Inc.
187-114, Yonhee-3-dong, Seodaemoon-gu
120-113 Seoul / KR
For all designated states
Kuhnil Pharm. Co., Ltd.
297-5, Gunseo-ri, Jiksan-cup, Cheonai-si
Chungcheongnam-do 330-811 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2005/25]For all designated states
Eyegene Inc.
187-114, Yonhee-3-dong, Sodaemoon-gu
120-113 Seoul / KR
For all designated states
Kuhnil Pharm. Co., Ltd.
297-5, Gunseo-ri, Jiksan-cup, Cheonai-si
Chungcheongnam-do 330-811 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / YOO, Won Il, 212-1005 Chunggu Apt.
Yangji-maeul, 36 Soonae-dong, Bundang-gu
Sungnam-si, 463-020 Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / LEE, Sung Ho
1403-1103 Okbit-maeul, Hwajung-dong, Duckyang-gu
Goyang-shi, 412-745 Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / PARK, Kunewoo
117-2201 CG Metrocity, Yongho-dong, Nam-gu
608-090 Busan / KR
04 / CHO, Yang Je, 106-204 Samsung Raemian Apt.
Dowon-dong, Yongsan-gu
140-070 Seoul / KR
05 / AHN, Bo Young
80-135 Bukgazwa 2-dong, Seodaemoon-gu
120-132 Seoul / KR
06 / KWON, Oh Woong, 1906-1302 Woosung Apt.
Gangsan-maeul, Ilsan-gu
Goyang-shi, 411-370 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2005/25]
Representative(s)polypatent
Postfach 40 02 43
51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/25]Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date03708726.920.03.2003
[2005/25]
WO2003KR00544
Priority number, dateKR2002004177116.07.2002         Original published format: KR 2002041771
[2005/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004007554
Date:22.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1543036
Date:22.06.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2004
[2005/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.01.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.06.2006
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68, G01N33/58
[2006/26]
Former International [2005/25]C07K16/18
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/25]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PROTEIN ZUR DIAGNOSE VON DIABETISCHER RETINOPATHIE[2005/25]
English:PROTEIN FOR DIAGNOSING DIABETIC RETINOPATHY[2005/25]
French:PROTEINE UTILISEE DANS LE DIAGNOSTIC DE LA RETINOPATHIE DIABETIQUE[2005/25]
Entry into regional phase12.02.2005National basic fee paid 
12.02.2005Search fee paid 
12.02.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
12.02.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.02.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR
12.02.2005Examination requested  [2005/25]
09.04.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/22]
02.01.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2008/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
04.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0121658  (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-2 * page 372, line 14 - line 22; sequences 112,145 *;
 [X]  - RODRIGUEZ-SEGADE S ET AL, "High serum IgA concentrations in patients with diabetes mellitus: agewise distribution and relation to chronic complications.", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY. JUL 1996, (199607), vol. 42, no. 7, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 1064 - 1067, XP002381324 [X] 1-2,6 * abstract *
 [X]  - EUN YOUNG LEE ET AL, "IMMUNOGLOBULIN A NEPHROPATHY IN PATIENTS WITH NON-INSULIN DEPENDENT DIABETES MELLITUS", JOURNAL OF KOREAN MEDICAL SCIENCE, KOREAN ACADEMY OF MEDICAL SCIENCE, SEOUL, KR, (1999), vol. 14, ISSN 1011-8934, pages 582 - 585, XP008047555 [X] 3-5 * abstract *
 [X]  - NICOLOFF GEORGE ET AL, "Changes in the serum levels of anti-elastin antibodies are associated with the development of microvascular complications in children with Type 1 diabetes mellitus", CENTRAL-EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2001), vol. 26, no. 1, ISSN 1426-3912, pages 17 - 23, XP002382011 [X] 1-2,6 * abstract *
 [A]  - KAWAMURA S ET AL, "Nucleotide sequence of the gorilla immunoglobulin alpha 1 gene.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH. 25 AUG 1989, (19890825), vol. 17, no. 16, ISSN 0305-1048, page 6732, XP002382012 [A] 2 * the whole document *
International search[X]  - "Ig alpha-1 chain C region", DATABASE GENBANK,
 [X]  - "Homo sapiens partial mRNA for immunoglobulin heavy chain constant region alpha 1 (IGHA1 gene)", DATABASE GENBANK,
 [Y]  - EUN YOUNG LEE ET AL., "Immunoglobulin A nephropathy in patients with non-insulin dependent diabetes mellitus", J. KOREAN MED. SCI., (1999), vol. 14, pages 582 - 585, XP008047555
 [Y]  - PEEBLES R.S. JR. ET AL., "IgA, IgG and IgM quantification in bronchoalveolar lavage fluids from allergic rhinitics, allergic asthmatics and nomal subjects by monoclonal antibody-based immunoenzymatic assays", J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (19950213), vol. 179, no. 1, pages 77 - 86, XP004021102

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(94)00275-2
 [A]  - STOLWIJK T.R. ET AL., "Analysis of tear fluid proteins in insulin-dependent diabetes mellitus", ACTA OPHTHALMOL., (1994), vol. 72, no. 3, pages 357 - 362, XP008047556