Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1594395

EP1594395 - APPARATUS FOR EVOKING AND RECORDING BIO-POTENTIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.02.2011
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.03.2011  [2011/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BrainScope Company, Inc.
16690 Swingley Ridge Road, Suite 140
Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US
[2007/34]
Former [2007/32]For all designated states
BS Holdings, Inc.
Suite 140, 16690 Swingley Ridge Road
Chesterfield, MO 63107 / US
Former [2005/46]For all designated states
Everest Biomedical Instruments
16690 Swingley Ridge Road
Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CAUSEVIC, Eldar
2287 Downey Terrace
Ellisville, MO 63011 / US
02 / CAUSEVIC, Elvir
16315 Autumn View Terrace
Ellisville, MO 63011 / US
03 / CHRISTIANSEN, Christian
17755 Drummer Lane
Chesterfield, MO 63005 / US
 [2005/46]
Representative(s)Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
Ladas & Parry LLP
Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/46]Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
LADAS & PARRY LLP Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date03709028.910.02.2003
[2005/46]
WO2003US03881
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004071289
Date:26.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1594395
Date:16.11.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004
[2005/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.08.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00, A61B5/04
[2005/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/46]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG FÜR AUFRUF UND AUFZEICHNUNG VON BIO-POTENZIALEN[2005/46]
English:APPARATUS FOR EVOKING AND RECORDING BIO-POTENTIALS[2005/46]
French:APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'EVOQUER ET D'ENREGISTRER DES BIO-POTENTIELS[2005/46]
Entry into regional phase05.09.2005National basic fee paid 
05.09.2005Search fee paid 
05.09.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
05.09.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.09.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.08.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.09.2005Examination requested  [2005/46]
23.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/10]
11.10.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
26.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200806   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2008
28.02.201008   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4601294  (DANBY HAL C [US], et al) [X] 1-10,19,20 * column 4, line 12 - line 27 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 12 *;
 [X]EP1238629  (MAICO DIAGNOSTIC GMBH [DE]) [X] 11-18,21 * paragraphs [0019] , [0021] , [0023] , [0025] * * figures 1-5 *
International search[X]US5740812  (COWAN JONATHAN D [US]);
 [X]US2002080988  (RAVIV GABRIEL [US]);
 [X]US4741344  (DANBY HAL C [US], et al);
 [A]US4781196  (KILLION MEAD C [US])