Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1485127


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.04.2012 No opposition filed within time limit published on  16.05.2012  [2012/20]
06.05.2011 (Expected) grant published on  08.06.2011  [2011/23]
29.04.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
29.04.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
18.02.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.12.2010 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.12.2010 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.10.2010 Change - divisional application(s) published on  24.11.2010  [2010/47]
28.04.2010 Change: Date of oral proceedings
28.04.2010 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
20.02.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.04.2009 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.04.2009 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.02.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.12.2008 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
21.02.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.12.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
25.09.2007 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.05.2007 First examination report
23.05.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.03.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.02.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.12.2006 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.08.2006 First examination report
08.08.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.02.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.12.2005 Supplementary search report published on  01.02.2006  [2006/05]
09.12.2005 Change - classification published on  25.01.2006  [2006/04]
12.08.2005 Change - classification published on  28.09.2005  [2005/39]
12.08.2005 Change - classification published on  28.09.2005  [2005/39]
27.04.2005 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
27.04.2005 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
23.02.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.02.2005 Request for preliminary examination
08.12.2004 Amendment by applicant
29.10.2004 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.12.2004  [2004/51]
29.10.2004 Request for examination filed published on  15.12.2004  [2004/51]
19.10.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
24.05.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
28.02.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
10.09.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
06.09.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
05.09.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
03.05.2003 PCT data prior to European publication