Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1485127

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IT 
 LI 
 LU 
 MC 
 NL 
 PT 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 TR 
Examination procedure19.04.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase22.09.2004National basic fee paid 
22.09.2004Search fee paid 
22.09.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.2004Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
European patent granted08.06.2011
Opposition procedure09.03.2012No opposition filed within time limit published on 16.05.2012 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:15.12.2004 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20040922
 
Event date:15.12.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:15.12.2004 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL LT LV MK RO
 
Event date:28.09.2005 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7C 07K 16/28 A
 
Event date:28.09.2005 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7A 61K 39/395 B
 
Event date:28.09.2005 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7G 01N 33/533 B
 
Event date:28.09.2005 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7G 01N 33/53 B
 
Event date:28.09.2005 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7A 61P 1/04 B
 
Event date:28.09.2005 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7A 61P 37/02 B
 
Event date:28.10.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK DE 1073997 HK
Code Expl.: REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:25.01.2006 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C07K 16/28 19950101AFI20050811BHEP
 
Event date:25.01.2006 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 39/395 19850101ALI20051207BHEP
 
Event date:25.01.2006 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01N 33/533 19850101ALI20051207BHEP
 
Event date:25.01.2006 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01N 33/53 19850101ALI20051207BHEP
 
Event date:25.01.2006 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61P 1/04 20000101ALI20051207BHEP
 
Event date:25.01.2006 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61P 37/02 20000101ALI20051207BHEP
 
Event date:25.01.2006 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61P 25/02 20000101ALI20051207BHEP
 
Event date:01.02.2006 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20051220
 
Event date:13.09.2006 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20060810
 
Event date:27.06.2007 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20060810
 
Event date:08.06.2011 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:08.06.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:15.06.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:06.07.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:21.07.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 60337325 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20110721
 
Event date:31.08.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI
 
Event date:06.09.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:07.09.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20110831
 
Event date:21.09.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Event date:03.10.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:03.11.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2367480 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20111103
 
Event date:04.11.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK T3 E 9995 SK
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK
 
Event date:22.11.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20110402101 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
Effective DATE:20111013
 
Event date:28.03.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AG4A E012379 HU
Code Expl.:+FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:30.03.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK GR 1073997 HK
Code Expl.:+STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:16.05.2012 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20120309
 
Event date:12.07.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 60337325 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
Effective DATE:20120309
 
Event date:07.10.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60337325 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:HUBER & SCHUESSLER, DE
 
Event date:08.10.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60337325 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:HUBER & SCHUESSLER, DE
 
Event date:07.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT PC4A
Code Expl.: TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT
OWNER NAME:BIOGEN IDEC INTERNATIONAL HOLDING LTD., BM
Effective DATE:20131031
 
Event date:08.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT PC4A
Code Expl.: TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT
OWNER NAME:BIOGEN IDEC MA INC., US
Effective DATE:20131031
 
Event date:28.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60337325 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:HUBER & SCHUESSLER, DE
Effective DATE:20131007
 
Event date:28.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 60337325 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER NAME:BIOGEN LDEC MA INC., US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: BIOGEN IDEC INTERNATIONAL HOLDING LTD. (BIIH), HAMILTON, BM
Effective DATE:20131008
 
Event date:28.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 60337325 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER NAME:BIOGEN LDEC MA INC., US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: ELAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SAN FRANCISCO, US
Effective DATE:20131007
 
Event date:28.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60337325 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:HUBER & SCHUESSLER, DE
Effective DATE:20131008
 
Event date:28.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 60337325 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER NAME:BIOGEN LDEC MA INC., CAMBRIDGE, US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: BIOGEN IDEC INTERNATIONAL HOLDING LTD. (BIIH), HAMILTON, BM
Effective DATE:20131008
 
Event date:28.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 60337325 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER NAME:BIOGEN LDEC MA INC., CAMBRIDGE, US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: ELAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SAN FRANCISCO, CALIF., US
Effective DATE:20131007
 
Event date:28.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 60337325 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER NAME:BIOGEN MA INC., CAMBRIDGE, US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: BIOGEN IDEC INTERNATIONAL HOLDING LTD. (BIIH), HAMILTON, BM
Effective DATE:20131008
 
Event date:28.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60337325 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:DF-MP DOERRIES FRANK-MOLNIA & POHLMAN PATENTAN, DE
Effective DATE:20131007
 
Event date:28.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 60337325 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER NAME:BIOGEN MA INC., CAMBRIDGE, US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: ELAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SAN FRANCISCO, CALIF., US
Effective DATE:20131007
 
Event date:28.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60337325 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:DF-MP DOERRIES FRANK-MOLNIA & POHLMAN PATENTAN, DE
Effective DATE:20131008
 
Event date:05.02.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140109 AND 20140115
 
Event date:18.04.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CA
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Effective DATE:20140311
 
Event date:18.04.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
OWNER NAME:BIOGEN IDEC MA INC., US
Effective DATE:20140311
 
Event date:30.04.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20140211
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:30.05.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20140128
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:28.11.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PUE
Code Expl.: ASSIGNMENT
OWNER NAME:BIOGEN IDEC MA INC., US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: ELAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., US
 
Event date:29.12.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU FH1C
Code Expl.: APPOINTMENT OF REPRESENTATIVE
Free Format Text:FORMER REPRESENTATIVE(S): SOMLAI MARIA, SBGK SZABADALMI UEGYVIVOEI IRODA, HU
Representatives Name:SBGK UEGYVIVOEI IRODA, HU
 
Event date:29.12.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU GB9C
Code Expl.: SUCCESSION IN TITLE
OWNER NAME:BIOGEN IDEC MA INC., US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER(S): ELAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., US
 
Event date:15.10.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MM01 512163 AT T
Code Expl.:-LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES
Effective DATE:20150225
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150225
 
Event date:30.11.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150225
 
Event date:17.02.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:17.02.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R039 60337325 DE
Code Expl.:-REVOCATION ACTION FILED
 
Event date:17.02.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R008 60337325 DE
Code Expl.: CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENT COURT
 
Event date:23.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL PD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP
OWNER NAME:BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.; US
Free Format Text:DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: VERANDERING VAN EIGENAAR(S), OVERDRACHT; FORMER OWNER NAME: ELAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Effective DATE:20151030
 
Event date:15.04.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60337325 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:DF-MP DOERRIES FRANK-MOLNIA & POHLMAN PATENTAN, DE
 
Event date:15.04.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 60337325 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER NAME:BIOGEN MA INC., CAMBRIDGE, US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: BIOGEN LDEC MA INC., CAMBRIDGE, MASS., US
 
Event date:23.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:26.01.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CA
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Effective DATE:20171215
 
Event date:26.01.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
OWNER NAME:BIOGEN MA INC., US
Effective DATE:20171215
 
Event date:21.02.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.05.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
OWNER NAME:BIOGEN MA INC., US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: BIOGEN IDEC MA INC., US
 
Event date:15.06.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE GB1A E005733 EE
Code Expl.: CHANGE IN THE OWNERSHIP OR IN THE ADDRESS OF THE OWNER
 
Event date:28.06.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU HC9C
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME, ADDRESS
OWNER NAME:BIOGEN MA INC., US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER(S): ELAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., US; BIOGEN IDEC MA INC., US
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SI SP73
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER
OWNER NAME:BIOGEN MA INC.; US
Effective DATE:20180611
 
Event date:11.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LU HC
Code Expl.: CHANGE/CORRECTION OF NAME AND/OR ADDRESS OF THE OWNERS
OWNER NAME:BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.; US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.
Effective DATE:20180903
 
Event date:11.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LU HC
Code Expl.: CHANGE/CORRECTION OF NAME AND/OR ADDRESS OF THE OWNERS
OWNER NAME:BIOGEN MA INC.; US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.
Effective DATE:20180903
 
Event date:11.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LU HC
Code Expl.: CHANGE/CORRECTION OF NAME AND/OR ADDRESS OF THE OWNERS
OWNER NAME:BIOGEN MA INC.; US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: BIOGEN MA INC.
Effective DATE:20180903
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20180225
 
Event date:29.03.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20190225
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20190222
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20190225
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20190226
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20190227
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Payment DATE:20190226
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20190225
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20190315
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20190222
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20190208
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20190124
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20190225
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Payment DATE:20190123
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Payment DATE:20190227
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Payment DATE:20190215
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20190225
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20190227
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20190225
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20190207
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:28.06.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Payment DATE:20190221
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:28.06.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20190226
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20190128
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Payment DATE:20190214
Year of Fee Payment:17