Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1485127

EP1485127 - ADMINISTRATION OF AGENTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2012
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2012  [2012/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ELAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
800 Gateway Boulevard
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
[2011/23]
Former [2004/51]For all designated states
Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
800 Gateway Boulevard
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TAYLOR, Julie
1506 7th Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94122 / US
02 / YEDNOCK, Ted, A.
184 Arroyo Road
Forest Knolls, CA 94933 / US
 [2004/51]
Representative(s)Schüssler, Andrea
Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler
Truderinger Strasse 246
81825 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/51]Schüssler, Andrea, Dr.
Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246
81825 München / DE
Application number, filing date03709277.225.02.2003
[2004/51]
WO2003US05421
Priority number, dateUS20020360134P25.02.2002         Original published format: US 360134 P
US20020374501P23.04.2002         Original published format: US 374501 P
[2004/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03072040
Date:04.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/36]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1485127
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003
[2004/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1485127
Date:08.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.05.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.2005
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/28, A61K39/395, G01N33/533, G01N33/53, A61P1/04, A61P37/02, A61P25/02
[2006/04]
Former International [2005/39]C07K16/28, A61K39/395, G01N33/533, G01N33/53, A61P1/04, A61P37/02
Former International [2004/51]A61K39/395, C07K16/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERABREICHUNG VON MITTELN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDUNGEN[2004/51]
English:ADMINISTRATION OF AGENTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATION[2004/51]
French:ADMINISTRATION D'AGENTS POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE INFLAMMATION[2004/51]
Entry into regional phase22.09.2004National basic fee paid 
22.09.2004Search fee paid 
22.09.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.09.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/51]
06.12.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2009Date of oral proceedings
07.12.2010Date of oral proceedings
30.12.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
07.01.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2011Fee for grant paid
19.04.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10012870.1  / EP2336184
EP10012871.9  / EP2360185
EP10012872.7  / EP2289941
EP16195336.9
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.08.2006
Opposition(s)09.03.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]US2001046496  (BRETTMAN LEE R ET AL) [X] 19-22 * figures 7,9; examples 1,2 *
 [DXY]  - TUBRIDY N ET AL, "The effect of anti-alpha4 integrin antibody on brain lesion activity in MS. The UK Antegren Study Group.", NEUROLOGY. 11 AUG 1999, (19990811), vol. 53, no. 3, ISSN 0028-3878, pages 466 - 472, XP008050557 [DX] 1-18,23-37,42-54,57,58 * the whole document * [Y] 38,41
 [DXY]  - GORDON FIONA H ET AL, "A randomized placebo-controlled trial of a humanized monoclonal antibody to alpha4 integrin in active Crohn's disease", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (200108), vol. 121, no. 2, ISSN 0016-5085, pages 268 - 274, XP008050508 [DX] 1-18,23-37,42-54,57,58 * the whole document * [Y] 39,40,55,56

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/gast.2001.26260
 [X]  - GORDON F H ET AL, "TREATMENT OF ACTIVE ULCERATIVE COLITIS WITH A RECOMBINANT HUMANISEDANTIBODY TO ALPHA4 INTEGRIN (ANTEGREN TM)", GASTROENTEROLOGY, W.B.SAUNDERS COMPANY, PHILADELPHIA, US, (199904), vol. 116, no. 4, PART 2, ISSN 0016-5085, page A726, XP001024675 [X] 1-18,23-37,42-54,57,58 * the whole document *
 [X]  - GORDON FIONA H ET AL, "Randomised double-blind placebo-controlled trial of recombinant humanised antibody to alpha4 integrin (Antegren(R)) in active Crohn's disease", GASTROENTEROLOGY, SAUNDERS, PHILADELPHIA, PA,, US, (199904), vol. 116, no. 4 PART 2, ISSN 0016-5085, page A726, XP002179755 [X] 1-18,23-37,42-54,57,58 * the whole document *
 [X]  - SHEREMATA W A ET AL, "A PLACEBO-CONTROLLED, SAFETY, TOLERABILITY DOSE ESCALATION, PK STUDY OF VARIOUS DOSES OF INTRAVENOUS ANTEGREN IN PATIENTS WITH MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS (MS)", NEUROLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, PHILADELPHIA, US, (199804), vol. 50, no. 4, SUPPL 4, ISSN 0028-3878, pages A63 - A64, XP001024677 [X] 1-18,23-37,42-54,57,58 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - ROBINSON M, "OPTIMIZING THERAPY FOR INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASE", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199712), vol. 92, no. 12, ISSN 0002-9270, pages 12S - 17S, XP000893013 [Y] 38-40,55,56 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - ANDERSSON PETER-BRIAN ET AL, "Glucocorticosteroid therapy for multiple sclerosis: A critical review", JOURNAL OF THE NEUROLOGICAL SCIENCES, (19980918), vol. 160, no. 1, ISSN 0022-510X, pages 16 - 25, XP002350553 [Y] 38,41 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-510X(98)00116-6
 [Y]  - GOODKIN D E, "Experimental therapies for multiple sclerosis: current status", CLEVELAND CLINIC JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, CLEVELAND, OH, US, (199202), vol. 59, no. 1, ISSN 0891-1150, pages 63 - 74, XP002092153 [Y] 38,41 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - BRYANT J ET AL, "Systematic review of immunomodulatory drugs for the treatment of people with multiple sclerosis: Is there good quality evidence on effectiveness and cost?", JOURNAL OF NEUROLOGY NEUROSURGERY AND PSYCHIATRY, (200105), vol. 70, no. 5, ISSN 0022-3050, pages 574 - 579, XP002350554 [Y] 38,41 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/jnnp.70.5.574
International search[Y]US5932214  ;
 [Y]US5840299  ;
 [Y]  - TILLEY ET AL., "VLA-4 Antagonists", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (2001), vol. 26, no. 10, pages 985 - 998, XP002975527

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.2001.026.10.858716