Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1614403

EP1614403 - HYDRAULIC DEVICE FOR THE INJECTION OF BONE CEMENT IN PERCUTANEOUS VERTEBROPLASTY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  16.05.2014
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.05.2014Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 18.06.2014  [2014/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Depuy Spine, Inc.
325 Paramount Drive
Raynham, MA 02767 / US
[2009/43]
Former [2006/02]For all designated states
Ferreyro Irigoyen, Roque Humberto
Sur 136, No 116, Col. Las Américas Del. Alvaro Obrego
México, D.F. 00120 / MX
For all designated states
Marquez Miranda, Mario
Km. 2.5, Carretera a Acatlima Huajuapan de Leon
Oaxaca 069000 / MX
Inventor(s)01 / Ferreyro Irigoyen, Roque Humberto
Sur 136, No 116, Col. Las Americas
Mexico, D.F. 00120 / MX
02 / Marquez Miranda, Mario
Km. 2.5, Carretera a Acatlima
Huajuapan de Leon, Oaxaca 069000 / MX
 [2009/43]
Former [2006/02]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Orr, Robert , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/43]Orr, Robert , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Former [2009/05]Belcher, Simon James , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Former [2008/38]Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Former [2007/01]van Westenbrugge, Andries
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2006/24](deleted)
...
Former [2006/02]Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto
Elzaburu S.A., Miguel Angel, 21
28010 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date03710527.714.03.2003
[2006/02]
WO2003MX00027
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004080357
Date:23.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1614403
Date:11.01.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004
[2006/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1614403
Date:17.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/46]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1614403
Date:18.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.09.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/46
[2006/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/02]
TitleGerman:HYDRAULISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR KNOCHENZEMENTEINSPRITZUNG BEI PERKUTANER VERTEBROPLASTIE[2006/02]
English:HYDRAULIC DEVICE FOR THE INJECTION OF BONE CEMENT IN PERCUTANEOUS VERTEBROPLASTY[2006/02]
French:DISPOSITIF HYDRAULIQUE D'INJECTON DE CIMENT OSSEUX UTILISE DANS LE DOMAINE DE LA VERTEBROPLASTIE PERCUTANEE[2006/02]
Entry into regional phase07.10.2005Translation filed 
07.10.2005National basic fee paid 
07.10.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.10.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.10.2005Examination requested  [2006/02]
02.03.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
04.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2010Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.05.2010
04.05.2010Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
07.06.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.2010Fee for grant paid
05.10.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10182693.1  / EP2311408
EP10182769.9  / EP2314259
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.08.2011   
Leeming, John Gerard
J.A. Kemp & Co.
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Opponent's representative
Perkins, Janet Frances
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2011/38]
Opponent(s)01  16.08.2011   
Leeming, John Gerard
J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Opponent's representative
Perkins, Janet Frances
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
GB-London WC1R 5JJ / GB
21.09.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.02.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.02.2012Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
22.08.2012Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
10.10.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.10.2013
25.10.2013Date of oral proceedings
15.11.2013Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.11.2013Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.03.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
07.05.2014Fee for printing new specification paid
Request for further processing for:04.12.2006Request for further processing filed
04.12.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.01.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.11.2010
CY17.11.2010
CZ17.11.2010
DK17.11.2010
EE17.11.2010
FI17.11.2010
HU17.11.2010
RO17.11.2010
SI17.11.2010
SK17.11.2010
TR17.11.2010
BG17.02.2011
GR18.02.2011
IE14.03.2011
PT17.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT17.11.2010
CY17.11.2010
CZ17.11.2010
DK17.11.2010
EE17.11.2010
FI17.11.2010
RO17.11.2010
SI17.11.2010
SK17.11.2010
TR17.11.2010
BG17.02.2011
GR18.02.2011
IE14.03.2011
PT17.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
Former [2011/38]AT17.11.2010
CY17.11.2010
CZ17.11.2010
DK17.11.2010
EE17.11.2010
FI17.11.2010
RO17.11.2010
SI17.11.2010
SK17.11.2010
BG17.02.2011
GR18.02.2011
PT17.03.2011
Former [2011/31]AT17.11.2010
CY17.11.2010
FI17.11.2010
SI17.11.2010
BG17.02.2011
GR18.02.2011
PT17.03.2011
Former [2011/24]CY17.11.2010
FI17.11.2010
PT17.03.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9728835  (LANG VOLKER [DE]) [X] 1-5 * page 6, line 4 - page 9, line 18; figures 1-3 *;
 [XA]EP0235905  (AL RAWI OMAR MAHMOOD ATIA) [X] 1,4,5 * page 3, line 3 - page 5, line 29; figure . * [A] 2,3;
 [A]GB2197691  (BRON DAN) [A] 1-5 * page 4, line 15 - page 8, line 11 * * page 13, line 6 - line 10; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1074231  (DIAGNOSTIC GRIFOLS S A [ES]);
 [A]US6383190  (PREISSMAN HOWARD E [US]);
 [A]US2003040718  (KUST RICHARD [US], et al);
 [A]US3063449  (SCHULTZ ARTHUR R P)
by applicantEP1074231
 US6383190
 US2003040718
OppositionGB179502045
 US4250887
 EP0235905
 WO9728835
    - M. LINDEBURG, "External Pressurized Liquids", MECHANICAL ENGINEERING REFERENCE MANUAL FOR THE PE-EXAM, (199705), vol. 10, pages 14 - 15
    - A. CROMER, Physics for the life science, USA, MCGRAW-HILL INC., (1997), vol. 2, pages 136 - 137