Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1485791

EP1485791 - EFFICIENTLY STORING INDENTED THREADS IN THREADED APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  13.11.2008
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2008Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.12.2008  [2008/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BEA Systems, Inc.
2315 North First Street
San Jose, CA 95131 / US
[2006/24]
Former [2004/51]For all designated states
Plumtree Software, Inc.
500 Sansome Street
San Francisco, CA 94111 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FRIEDEN, Kurt
1562 San Lorenzo Ave.
Berkeley, CA 94707 / US
02 / SRIKHANTA, Prasanna
66 O'Farrell St. 2
San Francisco, CA 94109 / US
 [2004/51]
Representative(s)Harris, Ian Richard
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/51]Harris, Ian Richard
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date03711411.328.02.2003
[2004/51]
WO2003US06694
Priority number, dateUS2002008578028.02.2002         Original published format: US 85780
[2004/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03073263
Date:04.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1485791
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003
[2004/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.09.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F7/00
[2004/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
TitleGerman:EFFIZIENTES SPEICHERN EINGERÜCKTER THREADS IN THREAD-ANWENDUNGEN[2004/51]
English:EFFICIENTLY STORING INDENTED THREADS IN THREADED APPLICATION[2004/51]
French:FILS DE DISCUSSION COUPES EN ZIGZAG ASSURANT UNE MEMORISATION EFFICACE DANS UNE APPLICATION A FIL DE DISCUSSION[2004/51]
Entry into regional phase22.09.2004National basic fee paid 
22.09.2004Search fee paid 
22.09.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.09.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/51]
04.11.2008Application withdrawn by applicant  [2008/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
18.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US5724577  (EXLEY FRANCIS E [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * column 3, line 1 - line 12; figure 2 * * column 4, line 22 - line 35 * * figure 3 *;
 [X]US6279007  (UPPALA RADHA KRISHNA [US]) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 13 * * column 8, line 20 - line 34 * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 13; figure 7 *;
 [X]US2001018698  (UCHINO KANJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-22 * paragraph [0139] - paragraph [0140]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0162] - paragraph [0167]; figures 9,10 *
International search[A]US6240418  (SHADMON MOSHE [IL]);
 [A]US5557786  (JOHNSON JR HAROLD E [US])