Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1490999

EP1490999 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNICATION OF DATA ON NETWORK ACCESS AND SERVICE TRANSACTIONS IN A TELECOMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.08.2009
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOTOROLA, INC.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US
[2005/01]
Inventor(s)01 / FOSTER, Gerry
60 Okus Road, Old Town
Swindon, Wiltshire SN1 4JT / GB
02 / KHAN, Farah, 26 Nightwood Copse
Peatmoor
Swindon, Wiltshire SN5 5DD / GB
 [2005/22]
Former [2005/01]01 / FOSTER, Gerry
23 Reynolds Way
Swindon, Wiltshire SN25 4GF / GB
02 / KHAN, Farah, 26 Nightwood Copse
Peatmoor
Swindon, Wiltshire SN5 5DD / GB
Representative(s)Jepsen, René Pihl , et al
Eltima Consulting
Grove House, Lutyens Close'
Chineham Court
Basingstoke, Hants RG24 8AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/02]Jepsen, René Pihl , et al
Eltima Consulting Grove House, Lutyens Close' Chineham Court
Basingstoke, Hants RG24 8AG / GB
Former [2005/01]Jepsen, Rene Pihl , et al
Eltima Consulting Shaftesbury Centre Percy Street
Swindon SN2 2AZ / GB
Application number, filing date03712034.217.03.2003
[2005/01]
WO2003EP02751
Priority number, dateGB2002000708826.03.2002         Original published format: GB 0207088
[2005/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03081842
Date:02.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1490999
Date:29.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003
[2004/53]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1490999
Date:15.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/14, H04M15/00
[2008/29]
Former International [2005/01]H04L12/14, H04M15/00, G06F17/60
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/01]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERSTELLEN UND ÜBERTRAGEN VON GEBÜHRENDATA AUF NETZWERKZUGANGS UND SERVICE-TRANSAKTIONEN IN EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ[2005/01]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNICATION OF DATA ON NETWORK ACCESS AND SERVICE TRANSACTIONS IN A TELECOMMUNICATION NETWORK[2005/01]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE CONSTRUCTION ET DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNEES CONCERNANT DES TRANSACTIONS DE SERVICE ET D'ACCES RESEAU DANS UN RESEAU DE TELECOMMUNICATION[2005/01]
Entry into regional phase26.10.2004National basic fee paid 
26.10.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
26.10.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.10.2004Examination requested  [2005/03]
21.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.2008Fee for grant paid
02.09.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.07.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
06.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CY15.10.2008
CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
SK15.10.2008
TR15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
GR16.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
IE17.03.2009
LU17.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
HU16.04.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2011/31]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
SK15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
GR16.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
IE17.03.2009
LU17.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
HU16.04.2009
Former [2011/21]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
SK15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
GR16.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
IE17.03.2009
LU17.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/48]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
SK15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
GR16.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
IE17.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/08]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
SK15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
IE17.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/07]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
SK15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
IE17.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2009/47]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
SK15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2009/43]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
SK15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/39]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CZ15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
SE15.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/36]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
EE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
RO15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/34]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/32]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/25]AT15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
SI15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/23]AT15.10.2008
BG15.01.2009
Cited inInternational search[E]EP1298599  (SIEMENS AG) [E] 1,3,4,6,7 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0054] * * figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0905961  (CIT ALCATEL) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0049] *;
 [A]WO0158110  (MCCONNELL RICHARD ;CLARKE SEAMUS (GB); MURPHY DENIS (GB); RODGERS) [A] 1-9 * page 5, line 17 - page 8, line 17 *;
 [A]WO0221865  (ALA LUUKKO SAMI ;SONERA OYJ (FI)) [A] 1-9 * claims 1-8 *;
 [A]WO0024161  (NOKIA NETWORKS OY ;WALLENIUS JUKKA (FI)) [A] 2 * claim 1 *;
 [A]  - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Service Requirement for the Open Services Access (OSA); Stage 1(EGPP TS 22.127 verion 4.2.0 Release 4)", ETSI TS 122 127, URL: http:77WEBAPP.ETSI.ORG/exchangefolder, (200106), XP002219713 [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [08.1] *