EP1486975 - RECORDING MEDIUM, RECORDING METHOD, AND RECORDING/REPRODUCING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Osamu, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Goddard, Frances Anna D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Goddard, Frances Anna D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03712669.5 | 12.03.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003JP02926 | Priority number, date | JP20020076217 | 19.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002076217 | [2004/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03079351 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1486975 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1486975 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/12, G11B20/10, G11B27/10 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
G11B20/1883 (EP,US);
G11B15/087 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (EP,US);
G11B20/1208 (EP,US);
G11B27/107 (EP,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G11B27/3063 (EP,US);
G11B5/00813 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/51] | G11B20/12, G11B20/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/48] |
Former [2004/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM, AUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN UND AUFZEICHNUNGS-/WIEDERGABEEINRICHTUNG | [2004/51] | English: | RECORDING MEDIUM, RECORDING METHOD, AND RECORDING/REPRODUCING DEVICE | [2004/51] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT, PROCEDE D'ENREGISTREMENT ET DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT/LECTURE | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2003 | Translation filed | 03.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 18.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5712740 (KIKUCHI AKIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5852534 (OZUE TADASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0981133 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US6271979 (YOSHIDA MASAKI [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [PA]US6425042 (IKEDA KATSUMI [JP], et al) [PA] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A] - ECMA, "Standard ECMA-329 8 mm Wide Magnetic Tape Cartridge for Information Interchange - Helical Scan Recording - AIT-3 Format", (20011201), URL: http://www.ecma-international.org/publications/files/ecma-st/ECMA-329.pdf, (20070807), XP002445792 [A] 1-12 * page 44 * * page 54 * * page 59 * * page 64 * * figure 41 * | International search | [A]EP0736869 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JPS6470965 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPH09139029 (SONY CORP) | by applicant | US5712740 | US5852534 | US6271979 | EP0981133 |