Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1489277

EP1489277 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A HONEYCOMB FILTER FOR PURIFYING EXHAUST GASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/52]HONEYCOMB FILTER FOR PURIFYING EXHAUST GASES
[2007/25]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  20.07.2012
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2012Opposition withdrawnpublished on 22.08.2012  [2012/34]
20.07.2012Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 22.08.2012  [2012/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IBIDEN CO., LTD.
1, Kandacho 2-chome
Ogaki-shi, Gifu 503-8004 / JP
[2012/34]
Former [2007/44]For all designated states
IBIDEN CO., LTD.
1, Kandacho 2-chome
Ogaki-shi, Gifu 503-8004 / JP
Former [2004/52]For all designated states
IBIDEN CO., LTD.
1, Kandacho 2-chome
Ogaki-shi, Gifu 503-8004 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shibata, Toshiaki, Ibiden Co., Ltd.
Ogakikita Kojo
1-1, Kitagata
Ibigawacho
Ibi-gun, Gifu 501-0695 / JP
 [2012/34]
Former [2004/52]01 / Shibata, Toshiaki, Ibiden Co., Ltd.
Ogakikita Kojo, 1-1, Kitagata, Ibigawacho
Ibi-gun, Gifu 501-0695 / JP
Representative(s)Hubert, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/24]Hubert, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Former [2010/27]Exner, Stefan , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie Bavariaring 26
80336 München / DE
Former [2006/22]Hart Davis, Jason , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Former [2004/52]Gillard, Marie-Louise , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date03712833.724.03.2003
[2004/52]
WO2003JP03495
Priority number, dateJP2002008123722.03.2002         Original published format: JP 2002081237
[2004/52]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03081001
Date:02.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1489277
Date:22.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003
[2004/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1489277
Date:31.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/44]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1489277
Date:22.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.10.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2006
ClassificationInternational:B01J35/04, F01N3/28, B01D39/20, B01D53/94, F01N3/022
[2006/18]
Former International [2004/52]F01N3/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/52]
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINES WABENFILTERS ZUR REINIGUNG VON ABGAS[2007/25]
English:METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A HONEYCOMB FILTER FOR PURIFYING EXHAUST GASES[2007/25]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UN FILTRE EN NID D'ABEILLE POUR PURIFICATION DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT[2007/25]
Former [2004/52]WABENFILTER ZUR REINIGUNG VON ABGAS
Former [2004/52]HONEYCOMB FILTER FOR PURIFYING EXHAUST GASES
Former [2004/52]FILTRE EN NID D'ABEILLE POUR PURIFICATION DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT
Entry into regional phase06.10.2004Translation filed 
05.10.2004National basic fee paid 
05.10.2004Search fee paid 
05.10.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
05.10.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.10.2004Examination requested  [2004/52]
12.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2007Date of oral proceedings
03.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.09.2007Fee for grant paid
12.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.07.2008  14.03.2012  WITHDRAWN
SAINT-GOBAIN CENTRE DE RECHERCHES ET D'ETUDES EUROPEEN
"Les Miroirs" - 18, Avenue d'Alsace
92400 COURBEVOIE / FR
Opponent's representative
Lucas, Francois, et al
Saint-Gobain Recherche
39, quai Lucien Lefranc
B.P. 135
93303 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2012/34]
Opponent(s)01  29.07.2008  14.03.2012  WITHDRAWN
SAINT-GOBAIN CENTRE DE RECHERCHES ET D'ETUDES EUROPEEN
"Les Miroirs" - 18, Avenue d'Alsace
92400 COURBEVOIE / FR
Opponent's representative
Lucas, Francois, et al
Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, quai Lucien Lefranc B.P. 135
F-93303 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR
Former [2008/36]
Opponent(s)01  29.07.2008   
SAINT-GOBAIN CENTRE DE RECHERCHES ET D'ETUDES EUROPEEN
"Les Miroirs" - 18, Avenue d'Alsace
92400 COURBEVOIE / FR
Opponent's representative
Lucas, Francois, et al
Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, quai Lucien Lefranc B.P. 135
F-93303 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR
04.09.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.03.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.12.2009Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
01.12.2009Date of oral proceedings
18.12.2009Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.12.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.04.2012Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
12.07.2012Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition18.02.2010Appeal received No.  T0360/10
19.04.2010Statement of grounds filed
14.03.2012Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CY31.10.2007
CZ31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
EE31.10.2007
FI31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
RO31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
SK31.10.2007
TR31.10.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
GR01.02.2008
ES11.02.2008
IE24.03.2008
LU24.03.2008
IT31.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
PT31.03.2008
HU01.05.2008
[2011/13]
Former [2010/37]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CY31.10.2007
CZ31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
EE31.10.2007
FI31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
RO31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
SK31.10.2007
TR31.10.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
GR01.02.2008
ES11.02.2008
IE24.03.2008
LU24.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
PT31.03.2008
HU01.05.2008
Former [2010/34]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CY31.10.2007
CZ31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
EE31.10.2007
FI31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
RO31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
SK31.10.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
GR01.02.2008
ES11.02.2008
IE24.03.2008
LU24.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
PT31.03.2008
HU01.05.2008
Former [2010/32]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CY31.10.2007
CZ31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
EE31.10.2007
FI31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
RO31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
SK31.10.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
GR01.02.2008
ES11.02.2008
IE24.03.2008
LU24.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2009/34]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CY31.10.2007
CZ31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
EE31.10.2007
FI31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
RO31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
SK31.10.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
GR01.02.2008
ES11.02.2008
IE24.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2009/11]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CZ31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
EE31.10.2007
FI31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
RO31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
SK31.10.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
GR01.02.2008
ES11.02.2008
IE24.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2009/08]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CZ31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
RO31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
SK31.10.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
ES11.02.2008
IE24.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2008/46]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CZ31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
RO31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
SK31.10.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
ES11.02.2008
MC31.03.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2008/39]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CZ31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
RO31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
SK31.10.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2008/35]AT31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CZ31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2008/29]AT31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2008/26]CH31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2008/24]CH31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
Documents cited:Search[E]EP1479882  (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [E] 3,4 * paragraphs [0014] , [0057] , [0058] , [0090] , [0093] , [0103] - [0107] - [0132] , [0134] , [0158] , [0160] *;
 [X]JP2001162121  (IBIDEN CO LTD) [X] 3,4 * paragraphs [0018] , [0027] - [0030] - [0039] - [0045] - [0061] - [0064] - [0067] , [0071] *;
 [X]JP2001162121  ;
 [X]EP1142619  (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 3,4 * paragraphs [0035] , [0055] , [0069] , [0109] , [0110]; examples serie,4 * * figures 13-15 *;
 [X]EP1138389  (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0002] , [0012] , [0023] , [0024] * * example - *;
 [X]EP0449556  (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 1 - line 4 * * page 4, line 25 - line 55 *;
 [A]EP0965735  (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010210), vol. 2000, no. 23, [X] 3,4 * abstract *
International search[X]WO0171170
 [X]JP2001289028
 [X]JP2002070545
 [A]JP2000220448
ExaminationEP0657204
 US4369132
 US5075276
OppositionUA4595662
 US4353854
 EP1174399
 EP1291061