Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03080729 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36613702 | 19.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100925578B | Global Dossier | 06.11.2009 | B1 | KR20040097194 | 17.11.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0308557 | 19.03.2003 | US36613702 | 19.03.2002 | US39109303 | 18.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4610905B | Global Dossier | 12.01.2011 | B2 | JP2005526154 | 02.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0308557 | 19.03.2003 | US36613702 | 19.03.2002 | US39109303 | 18.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003218292 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0308557 | 19.03.2003 | US36613702 | 19.03.2002 | US39109303 | 18.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1487919 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2006 | B1 | EP1487919 | 22.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0308557 | 19.03.2003 | US36613702 | 19.03.2002 | US39109303 | 18.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100341939C | 10.10.2007 | C | CN1653134 | 10.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US36613702 | 19.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60309574T | 04.10.2007 | T2 | DE60309574D1 | 21.12.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0308557 | 19.03.2003 | US36613702 | 19.03.2002 | US39109303 | 18.03.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7091267 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2006 | B2 | US2003181603 | 25.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36613702 | 19.03.2002 | US39109303 | 18.03.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE344824T | 15.11.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US36613702 | 19.03.2002 | US39109303 | 18.03.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2276053T | 16.06.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US36613702 | 19.03.2002 | US39109303 | 18.03.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200502314 | 16.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US36613702 | 19.03.2002 | US39109303 | 18.03.2003 |