Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1487919

EP1487919 - RESINOUS COMPOSITIONS, METHOD OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF AND ARTICLES FABRICATED FROM THE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, TR
published on 21.10.2009  [2009/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/52]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VENDERBOSCH, Robert, Walker
Grauwe Gans 40
NL-4617 KE Bergen op Zoom / NL
02 / KERNICK, William, A., III
3742 Brayden Drive
Evansville, IN 47711 / US
03 / BERNDSEN, Sjef, G.
Sint Felixstraat 19
NL-4411 DB Rilland / NL
 [2004/52]
Representative(s)Szary, Anne Catherine , et al
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]Szary, Anne Catherine , et al
London Patent Operation GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London
WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2004/52]Szary, Anne C. , et al
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Application number, filing date03714286.619.03.2003
[2004/52]
WO2003US08557
Priority number, dateUS20020366137P19.03.2002         Original published format: US 366137 P
US20030391093P18.03.2003         Original published format: US 391093 P
[2005/06]
Former [2004/52]US20020366137P19.03.2002
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03080729
Date:02.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1487919
Date:22.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003
[2004/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1487919
Date:08.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:C08L69/00
[2004/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/52]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DEREN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE ARTIKELN[2004/52]
English:RESINOUS COMPOSITIONS, METHOD OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF AND ARTICLES FABRICATED FROM THE COMPOSITION[2004/52]
French:COMPOSITIONS RESINEUSES, PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE CELLES-CI ET ARTICLES FABRIQUES A PARTIR DE CETTE COMPOSITION[2004/52]
Entry into regional phase19.10.2004National basic fee paid 
19.10.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
19.10.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.11.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.10.2004Examination requested  [2004/52]
11.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.2006Fee for grant paid
21.09.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.08.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.11.2006
BE08.11.2006
CH08.11.2006
CY08.11.2006
CZ08.11.2006
EE08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IT08.11.2006
LI08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
RO08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
TR08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
LU19.03.2007
IE20.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
PT09.04.2007
HU09.05.2007
[2009/43]
Former [2009/39]AT08.11.2006
BE08.11.2006
CH08.11.2006
CY08.11.2006
CZ08.11.2006
EE08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IT08.11.2006
LI08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
RO08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
LU19.03.2007
IE20.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2009/10]AT08.11.2006
BE08.11.2006
CH08.11.2006
CZ08.11.2006
EE08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IT08.11.2006
LI08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
RO08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
IE20.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2008/22]AT08.11.2006
BE08.11.2006
CH08.11.2006
CZ08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IT08.11.2006
LI08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
RO08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
IE20.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2008/10]AT08.11.2006
BE08.11.2006
CH08.11.2006
CZ08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IT08.11.2006
LI08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
RO08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
IE20.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2008/09]AT08.11.2006
BE08.11.2006
CH08.11.2006
CZ08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IT08.11.2006
LI08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
RO08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
MC31.03.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2007/47]AT08.11.2006
BE08.11.2006
CH08.11.2006
CZ08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IT08.11.2006
LI08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
RO08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2007/41]AT08.11.2006
BE08.11.2006
CH08.11.2006
CZ08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IT08.11.2006
LI08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
RO08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2007/40]AT08.11.2006
BE08.11.2006
CH08.11.2006
CZ08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IT08.11.2006
LI08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2007/30]AT08.11.2006
BE08.11.2006
CH08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
LI08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
Former [2007/28]AT08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
Former [2007/25]FI08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
Cited inInternational searchJPS58174438  [ ] (TOKYO PRINTING INK MFG CO LTD);
 [X]JPH10130486  ;
 [X]US5583174  (KOEHLER BURKHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10 * column 1, line 15 - line 61; examples 1,2 * * column 5, line 27 - line 45 * * column 5, line 48 - line 57 *;
 [A]US2002019466  (FALCONE NEAL STEVEN [US], et al)
 [X]  - TOKYO PRINTING INK MFG. CO., LTD., JAPAN, "Colored polycarbonate resin compositions", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 100:211017 CA, URL: STN, XP002244087 [X] 1-10 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10130486 A 19980519 (ARAKAWA CHEM IND CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * abstract *