Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1485700

EP1485700 - BATTERY MONITORING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2008
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 15.09.2010  [2010/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Power Designers LLC
Suite 4, 931 East Main Street
Madison, WI 53703 / US
[2007/31]
Former [2004/51]For all designated states
Power Designers LLC
Suite 4, 931 East Main Street
Madison, WI 53703 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KUTKUT, Nasser, H.
310 South Yellowstone Drive 4
Madison, WI 53705 / US
02 / BROBST, David
1243 Broadway Street
Chico, CA 95928 / US
 [2004/51]
Representative(s)Price, Nigel John King
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/51]Price, Nigel John King
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date03716013.212.02.2003
[2004/51]
WO2003US04174
Priority number, dateUS2002007767915.02.2002         Original published format: US 77679
[2004/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03071652
Date:28.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/35]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1485700
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2003
[2004/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1485700
Date:01.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/31]
Search report(s)International search reportUS05.02.2004
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP06.07.2005
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/36
[2005/33]
Former International [2004/51]G01N27/416
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
TitleGerman:BATTERIEÜBERWACHUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG[2004/51]
English:BATTERY MONITORING METHOD AND APPARATUS[2004/51]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF SERVANT AU CONTROLE D'UNE BATTERIE[2004/51]
Entry into regional phase14.09.2004National basic fee paid 
14.09.2004Search fee paid 
14.09.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
14.09.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/51]
29.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2007Fee for grant paid
19.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
CZ01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
EE01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SI01.08.2007
SK01.08.2007
TR01.08.2007
BG01.11.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
HU02.02.2008
IE12.02.2008
LU12.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
[2010/37]
Former [2010/34]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
CZ01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
EE01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SI01.08.2007
SK01.08.2007
BG01.11.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
HU02.02.2008
IE12.02.2008
LU12.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
Former [2010/32]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
CZ01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
EE01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SI01.08.2007
SK01.08.2007
BG01.11.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
IE12.02.2008
LU12.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
Former [2009/34]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CY01.08.2007
CZ01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
EE01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SI01.08.2007
SK01.08.2007
BG01.11.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
IE12.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
Former [2009/29]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CZ01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
EE01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SI01.08.2007
SK01.08.2007
BG01.11.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
IE12.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
Former [2009/11]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CZ01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
EE01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SK01.08.2007
BG01.11.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
IE12.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
Former [2009/08]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CZ01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SK01.08.2007
BG01.11.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
IE12.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
Former [2008/46]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CZ01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SK01.08.2007
BG01.11.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
MC28.02.2008
Former [2008/28]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CZ01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SK01.08.2007
BG01.11.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
Former [2008/25]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
CZ01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
SK01.08.2007
BG01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
Former [2008/22]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
BG01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/21]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
BG01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/13]AT01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
BG01.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/10]FI01.08.2007
NL01.08.2007
BG01.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/09]NL01.08.2007
BG01.11.2007
ES12.11.2007
Former [2008/08]ES12.11.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9934224  (TELSTRA R & D MAN PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-23 * column A; figures 1-18; claims 1-40 * * page 1, lines 3-5 * * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 10 * * page 9, lines 16-27 * * page 13, line 13 - page 14, line 5 * * page 16, lines 17-28 * * page 20, lines 15-18 * * page 23, lines 7-15 *;
 [X]WO9715839  (GLOBE UNION INC [US]) [X] 1-14,20-23 * column A; figures 1-5; claims 1-20 * * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 15 * * page 6, line 2 - page 10, line 27 *;
 [A]US5717310  (SAKAI KOUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * column A; figures 1-5; claims 1-7 * * column 2, lines 32-56 * * column 3, lines 5-45 *
International search[A]US5179340  (ROGERS WESLEY A [US]);
 [A]US5808469  (KOPERA JOHN J C [US])