Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1512069

EP1512069 - AN ADDRESS GENERATION UNIT FOR A PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.11.2009
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2015/21]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Former [2014/27]For all designated states
Ericsson Modems SA
impasse Colombelle 8 B
1218 Le Grand-Saconnex / CH
Former [2014/18]For all designated states
Ericsson Modems SA
Chemin du Champ-des-Filles 39
1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH
Former [2007/31]For all designated states
NXP B.V.
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
Former [2005/10]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / VAN BERKEL, Cornelis, H.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / MEUWISSEN, Patrick, P., E.
c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
 [2005/10]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2010/01]Style, Kelda Camilla Karen , et al
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London, WC1N 2BF / GB
Former [2008/49]Birchenough, Lewis , et al
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
Former [2008/14]van der Veer, Johannis Leendert , et al
NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
Former [2007/01]Pennings, Johannes , et al
NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
Former [2005/10]Eleveld, Koop Jan
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date03717501.507.05.2003
[2005/10]
WO2003IB01892
Priority number, dateEP2002007703424.05.2002         Original published format: EP 02077034
EP2002007861904.09.2002         Original published format: EP 02078619
[2005/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03100600
Date:04.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1512069
Date:09.03.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2003
[2005/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.08.2004
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/34, G06F9/38
[2005/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/10]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ADRESSENERZEUGUNGSEINHEIT FÜR EINEN PROZESSOR[2005/10]
English:AN ADDRESS GENERATION UNIT FOR A PROCESSOR[2005/10]
French:UNITE DE GENERATION D'ADRESSES DANS UN PROCESSEUR[2005/10]
Entry into regional phase27.12.2004National basic fee paid 
21.02.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
21.02.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.02.2005Examination requested  [2005/16]
10.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2014Date of oral proceedings
18.12.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
09.02.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination08.04.2015Appeal received No.  T1265/15
08.06.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.10.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
02.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
28.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
30.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
28.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 16
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 17
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9914663  (SIEMENS MICROELECTRONICS INC [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7,10 * page 6, line 17 - page 7, line 27 * * abstract * * page 2, line 6 - page 3, line 10 * * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 2 *;
 [A]GB2321984  (IBM [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1091290  (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE])
by applicantWO9914663
 WO0104765