Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1488396

EP1488396 - MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.11.2004
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.12.2004Interruptionpublished on 16.02.2005  [2005/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MUGLIA, Henry Arthur
Balanstrasse 136
81539 München / DE
[2004/52]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2004/52]
Representative(s)Friese, Martin
Andrae l Westendorp
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Balanstrasse 55
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/52]Friese, Martin
Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date03718699.619.03.2003
[2004/52]
WO2003EP02883
Priority number, dateDE200211214119.03.2002         Original published format: DE 10212141
[2004/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03079307
Date:25.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1488396
Date:22.12.2004
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003
[2004/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:G08B21/02, A61F5/00
[2004/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/52]
TitleGerman:ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM[2004/52]
English:MONITORING SYSTEM[2004/52]
French:SYSTEME DE SURVEILLANCE[2004/52]
Entry into regional phase18.10.2004National basic fee paid 
18.10.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
18.10.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.10.2004Examination requested  [2004/52]
Stay/Interruption10.12.2004Interruption of proceedings, reason: applicant died
[2005/07]
Cited inInternational search[X]US6239700  (HOFFMAN MARK S [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,13-15,18-21 * figures 5,8A,8B * * column 4, line 43 - line 59 * * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 46 * * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 2 * * column 9, line 3 - line 51 * * column 10, line 19 - line 21 * * column 11, line 21 - line 57 * * column 11, line 64 - column 12, line 8 * * column 14, line 3 - line 18 *;
 [XY]WO0026882  (STRATEGIC PRODUCT DEV [US]) [X] 1,5,9-11,16-19 * page 2, line 19 - line 21 * * page 7, line 2 - line 12 * * page 8, line 3 - line 6 * * page 8, line 17 - line 23 * * page 8, line 29 - line 31 * * page 9, line 22 - line 25 * * page 11, line 17 - page 12, line 9 * * page 13, line 1 - line 12 * * page 17, line 3 - line 14 * * page 20, line 23 - page 21, line 2 * * page 21, line 2 - line 3 * * figures 2A,2C,3, * [Y] 6,8;
 [YA]GB2319872  (SHARP NEIL [GB]) [Y] 6,8 * the whole document * [A] 7;
 [A]FR2794588  (LEWINER JACQUES [FR]) [A] 1,2 * page 6, line 15 - line 33 * * page 7, line 10 - line 18 *;
 [A]DE4324398  (GROS FRITZ [DE]) [A] 5-8 * the whole document *