Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1481252

EP1481252 - AUTOMATIC PRECISION PIPETTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2007
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 21.10.2009  [2009/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stago Instruments
125, avenue Louis Roche
92230 Gennevilliers / FR
[2004/49]
Inventor(s)01 / ABOU-SALEH, Khaled
13, place de Seine
F-92400 Courbevoie / FR
02 / ROUSSEAU, Alain
34, boulevard Henri IV
F-75004 Paris / FR
 [2004/49]
Representative(s)de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie
Cabinet Moutard
35 Rue de la Paroisse
B.P. 20513
78005 Versailles Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/42]de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie
Cabinet Moutard 35 Rue de la Paroisse B.P. 20513
78005 Versailles Cedex / FR
Former [2004/49]de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie
Cabinet Moutard, 35, rue de la Paroisse
78000 Versailles / FR
Application number, filing date03718866.113.02.2003
[2004/49]
WO2003FR00457
Priority number, dateFR2002000237925.02.2002         Original published format: FR 0202379
[2004/49]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03073108
Date:04.09.2003
Language:FR
[2003/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1481252
Date:01.12.2004
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003
[2004/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1481252
Date:11.10.2006
Language:FR
[2006/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:G01N35/10, B01L3/02
[2004/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHE PRÄZISIONSPIPETTIERVORRICHTUNG[2004/49]
English:AUTOMATIC PRECISION PIPETTING DEVICE[2004/49]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PIPETAGE AUTOMATIQUE DE PRECISION[2004/49]
Entry into regional phase10.08.2004National basic fee paid 
10.08.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
10.08.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.08.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/49]
02.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2006Fee for grant paid
24.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Licence(s)ID:01 00/exclusive
For:[AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR]
Licencee:Diagnostica Stago
9, rue des Frères Chausson
92600 Asnières / FR
Date:10.06.2005
[2005/36]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY11.10.2006
CZ11.10.2006
EE11.10.2006
SI11.10.2006
SK11.10.2006
BG11.01.2007
GR12.01.2007
LU13.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
HU12.04.2007
[2009/43]
Former [2009/39]CY11.10.2006
CZ11.10.2006
EE11.10.2006
SI11.10.2006
SK11.10.2006
BG11.01.2007
GR12.01.2007
LU13.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
Former [2008/48]CZ11.10.2006
EE11.10.2006
SI11.10.2006
SK11.10.2006
BG11.01.2007
GR12.01.2007
MC28.02.2007
Former [2008/04]CZ11.10.2006
SI11.10.2006
SK11.10.2006
BG11.01.2007
MC28.02.2007
Former [2007/49]CZ11.10.2006
IT11.10.2006
SI11.10.2006
SK11.10.2006
BG11.01.2007
MC28.02.2007
Former [2007/47]CZ11.10.2006
IT11.10.2006
SI11.10.2006
SK11.10.2006
BG11.01.2007
Former [2007/40]CZ11.10.2006
IT11.10.2006
SI11.10.2006
BG11.01.2007
Former [2007/25]SI11.10.2006
BG11.01.2007
Former [2007/14]SI11.10.2006
Cited inInternational search[T]FR2815719  (JUNIOR INSTRUMENTS [FR]) [T] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5474744  (LERCH ERICH [CH]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4926701  (TOMPKINS DAVID J [GB]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US3810720  (LARTIGUE G, et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4476095  (SCOTT ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 16 * * column 5, line 38 - line 67 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0569213  (WALLAC OY [FI]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 1 - line 46 * * figure 4 *;
 [A]EP0070571  (SCIENT MFG IND [US]) [A] 1 * page 13, line 16 - line 30 * * figures 1,12 *