Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1488057

EP1488057 - GUIDING APPARATUS FOR OPERATING A POOL CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2009
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grobler, Johannes Stephanus
173, Eufees Street Pretoria north
182 Gauteng Province / ZA
[2008/36]
Former [2004/52]For all designated states
Grobler, Johannes Stephanus
173, Eufees Street
Pretoria north, 182 Gauteng Province / ZA
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2004/52]
Representative(s)Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG
Brüsseler Ring 51
52074 Aachen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/52]Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Brüsseler Ring 51
52074 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date03719998.128.02.2003
[2004/52]
WO2003ZA00035
Priority number, dateUS20020364680P15.03.2002         Original published format: US 364680 P
US20020390429P19.06.2002         Original published format: US 390429 P
[2004/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03078764
Date:25.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1488057
Date:22.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003
[2004/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1488057
Date:03.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/36]
Search report(s)International search reportEP25.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:E04H4/16
[2004/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/52]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
TitleGerman:FÜHRUNGSEINRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINES SCHWIMMBECKENREINIGERS[2004/52]
English:GUIDING APPARATUS FOR OPERATING A POOL CLEANER[2004/52]
French:APPAREIL DE GUIDAGE UTILISABLE POUR LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTEME DE NETTOYAGE D'UN BASSIN[2004/52]
Entry into regional phase15.10.2004National basic fee paid 
15.10.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.10.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.10.2004Examination requested  [2004/52]
31.03.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.2008Fee for grant paid
22.07.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.06.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
29.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.09.2008
BE03.09.2008
CY03.09.2008
CZ03.09.2008
DK03.09.2008
EE03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
IT03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
SI03.09.2008
SK03.09.2008
TR03.09.2008
BG03.12.2008
SE03.12.2008
GR04.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
GB28.02.2009
IE28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
LU28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
FR02.03.2009
HU04.03.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2011/31]AT03.09.2008
BE03.09.2008
CZ03.09.2008
DK03.09.2008
EE03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
IT03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
SI03.09.2008
SK03.09.2008
BG03.12.2008
SE03.12.2008
GR04.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
GB28.02.2009
IE28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
LU28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
FR02.03.2009
HU04.03.2009
Former [2011/21]AT03.09.2008
BE03.09.2008
CZ03.09.2008
DK03.09.2008
EE03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
IT03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
SI03.09.2008
SK03.09.2008
BG03.12.2008
SE03.12.2008
GR04.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
GB28.02.2009
IE28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
LU28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
FR02.03.2009
Former [2010/48]AT03.09.2008
BE03.09.2008
CZ03.09.2008
DK03.09.2008
EE03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
IT03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
SI03.09.2008
SK03.09.2008
BG03.12.2008
SE03.12.2008
GR04.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
GB28.02.2009
IE28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
FR02.03.2009
Former [2010/23]AT03.09.2008
BE03.09.2008
CZ03.09.2008
DK03.09.2008
EE03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
IT03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
SI03.09.2008
SK03.09.2008
BG03.12.2008
SE03.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
GB28.02.2009
IE28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
FR02.03.2009
Former [2010/21]AT03.09.2008
BE03.09.2008
CZ03.09.2008
DK03.09.2008
EE03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
IT03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
SI03.09.2008
SK03.09.2008
BG03.12.2008
SE03.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
IE28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
FR02.03.2009
Former [2010/09]AT03.09.2008
BE03.09.2008
CZ03.09.2008
DK03.09.2008
EE03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
IT03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
SI03.09.2008
SK03.09.2008
BG03.12.2008
SE03.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
IE28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2010/07]AT03.09.2008
BE03.09.2008
CZ03.09.2008
DK03.09.2008
EE03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
IT03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
SI03.09.2008
SK03.09.2008
BG03.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
IE28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2009/47]AT03.09.2008
BE03.09.2008
CZ03.09.2008
DK03.09.2008
EE03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
IT03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
SI03.09.2008
SK03.09.2008
BG03.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2009/43]AT03.09.2008
BE03.09.2008
CZ03.09.2008
DK03.09.2008
EE03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
IT03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
SI03.09.2008
SK03.09.2008
BG03.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2009/39]AT03.09.2008
BE03.09.2008
CZ03.09.2008
DK03.09.2008
EE03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
IT03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
SI03.09.2008
SK03.09.2008
BG03.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
Former [2009/36]AT03.09.2008
BE03.09.2008
CZ03.09.2008
DK03.09.2008
EE03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
SI03.09.2008
SK03.09.2008
BG03.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
Former [2009/34]AT03.09.2008
BE03.09.2008
CZ03.09.2008
DK03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
SI03.09.2008
SK03.09.2008
BG03.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
Former [2009/25]AT03.09.2008
BE03.09.2008
CZ03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
SI03.09.2008
SK03.09.2008
BG03.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
Former [2009/24]AT03.09.2008
BE03.09.2008
CZ03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
SI03.09.2008
SK03.09.2008
BG03.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
Former [2009/23]AT03.09.2008
BE03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
SI03.09.2008
BG03.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
Former [2009/19]AT03.09.2008
BE03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
SI03.09.2008
ES14.12.2008
Former [2009/15]AT03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
SI03.09.2008
ES14.12.2008
Former [2009/12]FI03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
ES14.12.2008
Former [2009/09]NL03.09.2008
ES14.12.2008
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9853164  (HANDELMAN JOSEPH H [US], et al) [DA] 1,2,4-9,11,15,16,22,24,25 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0753633  (SWEEPY INT SA [FR]) [A] 1,2,4-8,24,25 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9851888  (BARACUDA INT CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4-8,24,25 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6119707  (JORDAN GINGER [US]) [A] 1,2,4-8,24,25 * the whole document *