EP1486078 - MANIPULATION OF TRANSACTION REPORTS IN A SIGNALING NETWORK ON AN EXCHANGE OF A NETWORK ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERWIMP, Gery Oudstrijderstraat 1 B-2140 Borgerhout / BE | [2004/51] | Application number, filing date | 03720191.0 | 17.03.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003DE00855 | Priority number, date | DE2002112375 | 20.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10212375 | [2004/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03079698 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1486078 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1486078 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/00 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
H04Q3/0025 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/24] |
Former [2004/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HANDHABUNG VON TRANSAKTIONSMELDUNGEN IN EINEM SIGNALISIERUNGSNETZWERK BEI EINEM AUSTAUSCH EINES NETZWERKELEMENTES | [2004/51] | English: | MANIPULATION OF TRANSACTION REPORTS IN A SIGNALING NETWORK ON AN EXCHANGE OF A NETWORK ELEMENT | [2004/51] | French: | MANIPLUATION DES MESSAGES DE TRANSACTION DANS UN RESEAU DE SIGNALISATION LORS D'UN ECHANGE D'UN ELEMENT RESEAU | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 02.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 09.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6314109 (OMAN JEFFRY RALPH [CA]) [X] 1-7 * column 2, lines 19-29 * * column 3, line 4 - column 6, line 32 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2001053218 (LEUNG ALEX [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0033] - [0042] * * paragraphs [0061] , [0062] * * figures 5,6 *; | [A]EP0817522 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1-7 * column 6, lines 1-42 * * column 7, lines 14-31 * * column 8, lines 1-54 * * figures 2,6A,7 *; | [A] - JABBARI B ET AL, "Comparison of TSS application layer protocols: TCAP (Q.771-775) and ROSE (X.219/X.229)", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 1993, INCLUDING A COMMUNICATIONS THEORY MINI-CONFERENCE. TECHNICAL PROGRAM CONFERENCE RECORD, IEEE IN HOUSTON. GLOBECOM '93., IEEE HOUSTON, TX, USA 29 NOV.-2 DEC. 1993, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19931129), ISBN 0-7803-0917-0, pages 1039 - 1044, XP010109877 [A] 1-7 * page 1040, paragraph 3 - page 1042, paragraph 2 * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.1993.318235 |