Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1497141

EP1497141 - TRANSPARENT SECURITY SUBSTRATE WITH MAGNETIC PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.05.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 28.06.2017  [2017/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
De La Rue International Limited
De La Rue House, Jays Close, Viables
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/03]For all designated states
De La Rue International Limited
De La Rue House, Jays Close, Viables
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB
Inventor(s)01 / SNELLING, James Peter
11 Stevens Green
Saint Mary Bourne
Andover, Hampshire SP11 6DF / GB
02 / ISHERWOOD, Roland
1 Paul's Heath Cottage
Cole Henley
Whitchurch, Hampshire RG28 7QJ / GB
03 / BROWN, Alan
30 Anton Road
Andover, Hampshire SP10 2EN / GB
 [2011/39]
Former [2005/03]01 / SNELLING, James Peter
11 Stevens Green, Saint Mary Bourne
Andover, Hampshire SP11 6DF / GB
02 / ISHERWOOD, Roland
1 Paul's Heath Cottage, Cole Henley
Whitchurch, Hampshire RG28 7QJ / GB
03 / BROWN, Alan
30 Anton Road
Andover, Hampshire SP10 2EN / GB
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/02]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2005/03]Bucks, Teresa Anne , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date03722756.824.04.2003
[2005/03]
WO2003GB01678
Priority number, dateGB2002000956425.04.2002         Original published format: GB 0209564
[2005/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03091952
Date:06.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1497141
Date:19.01.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003
[2005/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1497141
Date:28.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.01.2004
ClassificationInternational:B42D15/00
[2005/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/03]
TitleGerman:DURCHSICHTIGES SICHERHEITSDOKUMENT MIT MAGNETTEILCHEN[2005/03]
English:TRANSPARENT SECURITY SUBSTRATE WITH MAGNETIC PARTICLES[2005/03]
French:SUBSTRAT DE SECURITE AVEC PARTICULES MAGNETIQUES[2005/03]
Entry into regional phase12.10.2004National basic fee paid 
12.10.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
12.10.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.10.2004Examination requested  [2005/03]
08.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.2011Fee for grant paid
04.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.07.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.06.2012  05.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Metzler, Volker, et al
Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/32]
Opponent(s)01  26.06.2012  05.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
D-81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Metzler, Volker, et al
Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
02.08.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.02.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2013Reply to a communication from the opposition division
21.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.09.2016Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/09]
11.10.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.10.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
23.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
23.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
26.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE28.09.2011
CH28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
DK28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
LI28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
TR28.09.2011
BG28.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
PT30.01.2012
IE24.04.2012
LU24.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
[2017/26]
Former [2014/27]BE28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
DK28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
TR28.09.2011
BG28.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
PT30.01.2012
IE24.04.2012
LU24.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2014/21]BE28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
DK28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
TR28.09.2011
BG28.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
PT30.01.2012
IE24.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2013/29]BE28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
DK28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
BG28.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
PT30.01.2012
IE24.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2012/23]BE28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
GR29.12.2011
PT30.01.2012
Former [2012/21]BE28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
GR29.12.2011
Former [2012/18]BE28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
GR29.12.2011
Former [2012/12]CY28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
GR29.12.2011
Former [2012/10]FI28.09.2011
GR29.12.2011
Former [2012/09]FI28.09.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]FR2771111  (ARJO WIGGINS SA [FR]) [X] 1-22 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS5697649
by applicantEP0407550