blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1620968

EP1620968 - MULTIPHASE CLOCK RECOVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.12.2011
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2011/06]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Former [2006/05]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / FREDRIKSSON, Jesper
Vasagatan 5A
S-753 13 Uppsala / SE
 [2006/05]
Representative(s)Sjöberg, Mats Hakan
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Core Networks, Älvsjö
Box 1505
125 25 Älvsjö / SE
[N/P]
Former [2006/05]Sjöberg, Mats Hakan
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Core Networks, Älvsjö Box 1505
125 25 Älvsjö / SE
Application number, filing date03723577.729.04.2003
[2006/05]
WO2003SE00699
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004105303
Date:02.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1620968
Date:01.02.2006
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2006/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1620968
Date:09.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE02.12.2004
ClassificationIPC:H04L7/033
[2006/05]
CPC:
H04L7/0338 (EP,US); H03L7/0812 (EP,US); H03L7/0995 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/05]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEHRPHASENTAKTWIEDERGEWINNUNG[2006/05]
English:MULTIPHASE CLOCK RECOVERY[2006/05]
French:RECUPERATION D'HORLOGE MULTIPHASE[2006/05]
Entry into regional phase29.11.2005National basic fee paid 
29.11.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
29.11.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.09.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
01.11.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.11.2005Examination requested  [2006/05]
23.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.2010Fee for grant paid
16.12.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2012/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
HU09.02.2011
IT09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
TR09.02.2011
IE29.04.2011
LU29.04.2011
CH30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
FR02.05.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IT09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
TR09.02.2011
IE29.04.2011
LU29.04.2011
CH30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
FR02.05.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2013/25]AT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IT09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
IE29.04.2011
LU29.04.2011
CH30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
FR02.05.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2012/23]AT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
IT09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
IE29.04.2011
CH30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
FR02.05.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2012/20]AT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
IE29.04.2011
CH30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
FR02.05.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2012/08]AT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
CH30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
FR02.05.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2012/07]AT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
CH30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2011/51]AT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2011/49]AT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
CZ09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
RO09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
SK09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2011/47]AT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
DK09.02.2011
EE09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2011/39]AT09.02.2011
BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2011/37]BE09.02.2011
CY09.02.2011
FI09.02.2011
SE09.02.2011
SI09.02.2011
BG09.05.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Former [2011/36]SE09.02.2011
GR10.05.2011
ES20.05.2011
PT09.06.2011
Cited inInternational search[A]US5197086  (JACKSON FREDERICK E [US], et al);
 [A]EP0648033  (BELL TELEPHONE MFG [BE], et al);
 [X]EP0822683  (CSELT CENTRO STUDI LAB TELECOM [IT]);
 [A]EP1172962  (TEKTRONIX INC [US]);
 [AP]EP1331750  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US])
by applicantUS4189622
 US4415984
 US4821297
 EP0390958
 US4977582
 EP0480165
 US5488641
 EP0822683
 US5822386
 US6044122
 US6130584
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.